Lopez v. City of Vallejo
Plaintiff: Rodolfo Lopez
Defendant: City of Vallejo and City of Vallejo Police Department
Case Number: 4:2020cv05838
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of Vallejo Police Department. Filed byRodolfo Lopez. (Oliver, George) (Filed on 9/26/2020)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to City of Vallejo, City of Vallejo Police Department. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Oliver, George) (Filed on 9/24/2020)
August 20, 2020 #Electronic filing error. The summons will not be issued as to Doe Defendants. Please remove the Doe Defendants from the proposed summons and re-file in its entirety. This filing w ill not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by Rodolfo Lopez. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Oliver, George) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Vallejo ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14833050.). Filed byRodolfo Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Oliver, George) (Filed on 8/18/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. City of Vallejo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Vallejo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Vallejo Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodolfo Lopez
Represented By: George D. Oliver, Esqui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?