Muniz v. Saul
Plaintiff: Tina M Muniz
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 4:2020cv05848
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for all further proceedings. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 9/11/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for All Purposes including trial and entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/10/2020. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 5, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew M. Saul.. (Bradt, Lara) (Filed on 9/5/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of Receipt as to #8 Summons Issued as to USA. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Andrew M. Saul on 9/2/2020. Waiver of Service due by 11/2/2020. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 Summons and Complaint, Scheduling Order, and #6 Order sent to U.S. Attorney's Office via email. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 CORRECTED Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 USM-285)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul. (Attachments: #1 USM 285)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and for Issuance of Summons and Service of Process. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tina M Muniz.. (Sackett, Harvey) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis IFP filed by Tina M Muniz. (Sackett, Harvey) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Judicial Review of Decision of Commissioner of Social Security against Andrew M. Saul. Filed byTina M Muniz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sackett, Harvey) (Filed on 8/19/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muniz v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina M Muniz
Represented By: Harvey Peter Sackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Lara Anne Oravec Bradt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?