Atmospheric and Space Technology Research Associates, LLC v. Astra Space, Inc.
Plaintiff: Atmospheric and Space Technology Research Associates, LLC doing business as ASTRA
Defendant: Astra Space, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv05859
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Atmospheric and Space Technology Research Associates, LLC. Service waived by Astra Space, Inc. waiver sent on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Van Loon, Erica) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER:Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2020 02:30 PM in Oakland, Chambers. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 9/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 9/3/20. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Atmospheric and Space Technology Research Associates, LLC.. (Van Loon, Erica) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Astra Space, Inc.. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/20/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/3/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding trademarks (cc: form mailed to register). (Van Loon, Erica) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Atmospheric and Space Technology Research Associates, LLC (Van Loon, Erica) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Van Loon, Erica) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Astra Space, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14838110.). Filed byAtmospheric and Space Technology Research Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Van Loon, Erica) (Filed on 8/19/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atmospheric and Space Technology Research Associates, LLC v. Astra Space, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atmospheric and Space Technology Research Associates, LLC doing business as ASTRA
Represented By: Erica J. Van Loon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astra Space, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?