Buchanan v. Administrative Office of Courts
Plaintiff: John Buchanan
Defendant: Administrative Office of Courts
Case Number: 4:2020cv05976
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 Mail sent to John Buchanan returned as undeliverable - Insufficient Address - Unable to Forward re #9 Order. ***10/9/2020, resent mail with included apartment number.*** (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2020) Modified on 10/9/2020 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/21/2020. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/17/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 02:00 PM. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 09/18/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 17, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by John Buchanan. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SCREENING COMPLAINT. The #3 motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is granted. Amended Complaint due by 10/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 9/2/2020. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 9/2/2020 (mklS, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 Received Document by John Buchanan. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by John Buchanan. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/16/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/23/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Administrative Office of Courts. Filed byJohn Buchanan. Consent/Declination due by 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buchanan v. Administrative Office of Courts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administrative Office of Courts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?