Langer v. Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Chris Langer
Defendant: Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc., The Reinalt-Thomas Corporation and Discount Tire Co., Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv06151
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (A.D.A. CASE):Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/14/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/21/2021 02:30 PM in Telephone Conference Only. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 10/21/2020. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 10/20/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 18 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Discount Tire Co., Inc., Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc., The Reinalt-Thomas Corporation.. (Humphreys, Scott) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #15 Stipulation to Withdraw Request for Default and Extend Time for All Defendants to Respond to Complaint. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 10/20/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #10 Stipulation to Withdraw Request for Default and Extend Time for All Defendants to Respond to Complaint filed by Discount Tire Co., Inc., Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc., The Reinalt-Thomas Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Humphreys, Scott) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Brian W. LaCorte. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Brian W. LaCorte) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15024988.) filed by Discount Tire Co., Inc., Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc., The Reinalt-Thomas Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - Arizona District Court, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Arizona Supreme Court)(LaCorte, Brian) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Entry of Default (As to Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc., a California Corporation only) filed by Chris Langer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amanda Seabock, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chris Langer. The Reinalt-Thomas Corporation served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (Handy, Russell) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint filed by Discount Tire Co., Inc.. (Nikdel, Susan) (Filed on 9/23/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chris Langer. Discount Tire Co., Inc. served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020. (Handy, Russell) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 12, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chris Langer. Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc. served on 9/8/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 9/12/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Chris Langer.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Price, Dennis) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Discount Tire Co., Inc., Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc., The Reinalt-Thomas Corporation. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/15/2020. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Handy, Russell) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Chris Langer re #1 Complaint (Handy, Russell) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14884232.). Filed byChris Langer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Handy, Russell) (Filed on 9/1/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langer v. Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc.
Represented By: Brian W. LaCorte
Represented By: Scott S. Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Reinalt-Thomas Corporation
Represented By: Brian W. LaCorte
Represented By: Scott S. Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discount Tire Co., Inc.
Represented By: Susan N. Nikdel
Represented By: Brian W. LaCorte
Represented By: Scott S. Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Langer
Represented By: Russell Clive Handy
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?