Onyeije et al v. GEICO Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Khadijatu G. Onyeije and Patrick Onyeije
Defendant: GEICO Indemnity Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv06564
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Referring Judge: Alex G Tse
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Patrick Onyeije (Emeziem, Kelechi) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Khadijatu G. Onyeije (Emeziem, Kelechi) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
October 27, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Khadijatu G. Onyeije, Patrick Onyeije (Emeziem, Kelechi) (Filed on 10/27/2020) Modified on 10/28/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/28/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/14/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/21/2021 at 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/16/2020. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 10/15/20. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GEICO Indemnity Company (Derringer, Jordan) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by GEICO Indemnity Company.. (Derringer, Jordan) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GEICO Indemnity Company re #1 Notice of Removal, 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, (Derringer, Jordan) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet by GEICO Indemnity Company . (Derringer, Jordan) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Case has been randomly assigned to magistrate judge, however incorrect Civil Cover Sheet used at case opening of JS44 (Rev. 09/19). Please complete and re -file in its entirety as a separate docket entry Civil Cover Sheet JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 07/19] re: Complaint #1 . #5 Notice of Removal, filed by GEICO Indemnity Company (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/2/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by GEICO Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent Geico Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for GEICO Indemnity Company. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Derringer, Jordan) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG20069598. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14959283). Filed byGEICO Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Service of Process Trasmittal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Answer (State Court), #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - All State Court Documents, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Derringer, Jordan) (Filed on 9/18/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Onyeije et al v. GEICO Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khadijatu G. Onyeije
Represented By: Kelechi Charles Emeziem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Onyeije
Represented By: Kelechi Charles Emeziem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Indemnity Company
Represented By: Jordan S Derringer
Represented By: John T. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?