(PS) Howard v. Daly et al
Plaintiff: Stanley Howard
Defendant: Mike Santomassimo, Mary C. Daly and John Shrewsberry
Case Number: 4:2020cv06890
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 11 Amended Emergency Motion for Order Declaring Entity be Wound up and Dissolved filed by Stanley Howard. Responses due by 12/7/2020. Replies due by 12/14/2020. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING #2 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS: Plaintiff must pay the entire filing fee of $400.00 in full no later than 12/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/10/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 30, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT filed by Stanley Howard. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2020)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SUBMIT COMPLETE IFP APPLICATION re #2 : Plaintiff is ordered to file a completed IFP application using the Northern District of California's form, located at https://cand.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/ or pay the filing fee by no later than 11/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/19/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/30/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/6/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 2, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Acknowledging Receipt of Case Transfer in from the Eastern District of California, Case No. 2:20cv01808JAMAC. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-01808. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS re #3 Order, Case Transferred Out to Another District, Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis on *9/18/2020* to * U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California* *450 Golden Gate Ave, 16th Fl* *San Francisco, CA 94102-3434*. ** *Electronic Documents: 1 to 3 * (Kastilahn, A)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/17/2020 TRANSFERRING this matter to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (Kastilahn, A)
September 18, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on Stanley Howard. (Kastilahn, A)
September 9, 2020 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Huang, H)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Stanley Howard. (Huang, H)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mary C. Daly, Mike Santomassimo, John Shrewsberry by Stanley Howard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Huang, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Howard v. Daly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Santomassimo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary C. Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Shrewsberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?