Hoak v. United Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Sunit Anandwala, John Nevraumont and Ann Hoak
Defendant: United Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv07069
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 25 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:20-cv-01152. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 7, 2020 Filing 24 CERTIFIED COPY OF TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado, 20-cv-01152 CMA-GPG, to the Northern District of California, to become part of MDL 2955 by Clerk on 10/7/2020. (evana, )
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER vacating Telephonic Scheduling Conference which had been set for 8/11/2020 10:00 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on July 9, 2020. Text Only Entry (gpgsec, )
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting #21 Defendant's Motion to Stay pending resolution of the Motion for Transfer and Coordination of Actions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, filed in In re: National Ski Pass Insurance Litigation, MDL No. 2955 (the "MDL Motion"); The parties shall file a joint notice informing the Court of the outcome of the MDL Motion within 7 days after the order is entered. If an order has not been entered by October 12, 2020, the parties shall file quarterly status updates beginning on that date; In the event this action is not transferred or consolidated upon resolution of the MDL Motion, Defendant's time to answer or respond to the Amended Complaint is extended until 30 days after resolution of the MDL Motion; and Any other deadlines in this action are hereby vacated, unless superseded by further order of this Court. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/9/2020.(evana, )
June 29, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation and Unopposed Motion to Temporarily Extend Defendants Answer Deadline by Defendant United Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Castro, Adrian)
June 23, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas J. Cahill on behalf of United Specialty Insurance CompanyAttorney Thomas J. Cahill added to party United Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Cahill, Thomas)
June 23, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by James J. Regan on behalf of United Specialty Insurance CompanyAttorney James J. Regan added to party United Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Regan, James)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/11/2020 10:00 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. At the time of the hearing, parties are to call the Courtroom at 888-363-4749, Access Code: 3136546#. Scheduling Order due to Gallagher_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov one week in advance. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on June 17, 2020. Text Only Entry (gpgsec, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant United Specialty Insurance Company.. (Castro, Adrian)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Denying Without Prejudice #14 Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Interim Class Counsel Pursuant to Rule 23(g), by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/5/2020.(evana, )
May 27, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. United Specialty Insurance Company served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020. (Feierabend, Joseph)
May 26, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Interim Class Counsel Pursuant to Rule 23(G) by Plaintiffs Sunit Anandwala, Ann C. Hoak, John Nevraumont. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Stueve, Patrick) (Modified on 5/28/2020 edited the title of the text to reflect the title of the document filed)(evana, ).
May 19, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew William Lytle on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Matthew William Lytle added to party Sunit Anandwala(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew William Lytle added to party Ann C. Hoak(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew William Lytle added to party John Nevraumont(pty:pla) (Lytle, Matthew)
May 19, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John J. Schirger on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney John J. Schirger added to party Sunit Anandwala(pty:pla), Attorney John J. Schirger added to party Ann C. Hoak(pty:pla), Attorney John J. Schirger added to party John Nevraumont(pty:pla) (Schirger, John)
May 19, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (evana, )
May 18, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS REQUEST as to United Specialty Insurance Company re #9 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Ann C. Hoak. (Feierabend, Joseph)
May 18, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against United Specialty Insurance Company, filed by Ann C. Hoak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Feierabend, Joseph) (Modified on 5/19/2020 edited duplicate text)(evana, ).
May 18, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading by Plaintiff Ann C. Hoak (Feierabend, Joseph)
May 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ethan Michael Lange on behalf of Ann C. HoakAttorney Ethan Michael Lange added to party Ann C. Hoak(pty:pla) (Lange, Ethan)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This matter has its factual nexus in Eagle County. According to the Court's Revised Jury Plan for Random Jury Selection, this case is therefore properly designated for Jury Division 3. Because the jury will be drawn from that Division, it is appropriate that the case be managed, for pretrial purposes, by Magistrate Judge Gallagher in Grand Junction. Accordingly, pursuant to D.C. Colo. L. Civ. R. 40.1(a), and as approved by the Chief Judge of the Court, the undersigned directs that the Clerk of the Court reassign this action to Magistrate Judge Gallagher as the referral judge. All further pleadings in this case shall reflect the case number of 20-cv-01152-CMA-GPG. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/29/2020. Text Only Entry (cmalc2)
April 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stephen Robert Miller on behalf of Ann C. HoakAttorney Stephen Robert Miller added to party Ann C. Hoak(pty:pla) (Miller, Stephen)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than July 27, 2020, in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/28/2020. Text Only Entry (cmalc2)
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (trvo, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United Specialty Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7265163)Attorney Joseph Michael Feierabend added to party Ann C. Hoak(pty:pla), filed by Ann C. Hoak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Certificate of Season Ski Pass Insurance, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Acknowledgement Letter, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Coverage Position)(Feierabend, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoak v. United Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Adrian Peter Castro
Represented By: James J. Regan
Represented By: Thomas J. Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunit Anandwala
Represented By: Joseph Michael Feierabend
Represented By: Ethan Michael Lange
Represented By: Patrick Stueve
Represented By: John J Schirger
Represented By: Matthew William Lytle
Represented By: Stephen Robert Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Nevraumont
Represented By: Joseph Michael Feierabend
Represented By: Ethan Michael Lange
Represented By: Patrick Stueve
Represented By: John J Schirger
Represented By: Matthew William Lytle
Represented By: Stephen Robert Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Hoak
Represented By: Joseph Michael Feierabend
Represented By: Ethan Michael Lange
Represented By: Patrick Stueve
Represented By: John J Schirger
Represented By: Matthew William Lytle
Represented By: Stephen Robert Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?