Charles v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Cheryl Charles
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 4:2020cv07854
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/3/2021; Close of Fact Discovery due by 7/16/2021; Opening Reports due by 7/30/2021; Rebuttal Reports due by 8/13/2021. Close of Expert Discovery due by 9/3/2021. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2021 02:00 PM before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Pretrial Conference set for 2/1/2022 03:00 PM before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; and Jury Selection /Jury Trial (5-day)set for 2/28/2022 08:30 AM before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. **This order terminates docket no. #17 .** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/17/2021. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021)
February 16, 2021 Filing 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER re 16 Case Management Conference - Initial, Set Deadlines filed by Target Corporation, and Cheryl Charles. (Livingston, Renee) (Filed on 2/16/2021) Modified on 2/17/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2021 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/9/2021. Total Time in Court: 12 Minutes. Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Matthew Taylor. Defendant Attorney: Renee Livingston. The Court is of the view that the case should be tried within approximately one year, with February 21, 2022 as the target trial date. Parties are directed to meet and confer and e-file within one week from today (February 16th) a stipulation and proposed order setting a case schedule shorter than previously proposed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/9/2021)
February 2, 2021 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE RE DOCKET NO. 11 . Notice is hereby given that the case management conference previously set for February 9, 2021 will be held telephonically. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.). This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2021)
February 1, 2021 Filing 14 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Target Corporation, and Cheryl Charles. (Livingston, Renee) (Filed on 2/1/2021) Modified on 2/2/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2021 Filing 13 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Alexandroff, Andrew) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 12 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Livingston, Renee) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
November 24, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for February 9, 2021, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by February 2, 2021. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:20-cv-07854-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 11/23/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 20, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Cheryl Charles.. (Taylor, Matthew) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
November 20, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Target Corporation of Initial Removal Documents (Livingston, Renee) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
November 20, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
November 20, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Target Corporation.. (Livingston, Renee) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
November 20, 2020 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Target Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Target Corporation for Target Corporation. (Livingston, Renee) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
November 20, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cheryl Charles. (Alexandroff, Andrew) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/2/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/9/2021 01:30 PM. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2020)
November 9, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint by Target Corporation. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/20/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION For Removal of Action Pursuant to 28 USC 1441(b) [Diversity]; Demand for Jury Trial against Cheryl Charles (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-15164610). Filed byTarget Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Livingston, Renee) (Filed on 11/6/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charles v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Charles
Represented By: Matthew Morgan Taylor
Represented By: Arin Khodaverdian
Represented By: Andrew V Alexandroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Renee Welze Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?