Commstech LLC v. Dialogic (US) Inc.
Plaintiff: Commstech LLC
Defendant: Dialogic (US) Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv08082
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Dialogic (US) Inc.. Service waived by Dialogic (US) Inc. waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Pomeroy, Michael) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
November 20, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for February 16, 2021, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Statement due by February 9th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:20-cv-08082-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 11/19/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 18, 2020 Filing 12 Corrected Summons Issued as to Dialogic (US) Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 18, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 18, 2020 Filing 10 *Erroneous Entry - please disregard and refer to document #12 Summons Issued as to Dialogic (US) Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2020) Modified on 11/18/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
November 18, 2020 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/11/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2021 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 17, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Commstech LLC.. (Ritcheson, Steven) (Filed on 11/17/2020)
November 17, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Commstech LLC (Ritcheson, Steven) (Filed on 11/17/2020)
November 17, 2020 Filing 6 Civil Cover Sheet by Commstech LLC (Amended). (Ritcheson, Steven) (Filed on 11/17/2020)
November 17, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Please re-submit a Signed and Dated Civil Cover Sheet. [err201] Re: #2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Commstech LLC. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/20 20)
November 17, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/1/2020. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2020)
November 17, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Ritcheson, Steven) (Filed on 11/17/2020)
November 17, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding patent infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (Ritcheson, Steven) (Filed on 11/17/2020)
November 17, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Commstech LLC . (Ritcheson, Steven) (Filed on 11/17/2020)
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Dialogic (US) Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15201232). Filed by Commstech LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ritcheson, Steven) (Filed on 11/17/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commstech LLC v. Dialogic (US) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commstech LLC
Represented By: Steven Whitefield Ritcheson
Represented By: Raymond William Mort, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dialogic (US) Inc.
Represented By: Michael Clayton Pomeroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?