Masters v. Broomfield
Petitioner: Jarvis J Masters
Respondent: Acting Warden, Calif Ron Broomfield
Not Classified By Court: Habeas Corpus Resource Center, Habeas Capital Notification and California Appellate Project
Case Number: 4:2020cv08206
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: DPLC JHC
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/7/2021. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/26/2021 03:00 PM. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
December 28, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Alice Bemis Lustre (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lustre, Alice) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Re: Erica Williams.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 3, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Erica Williams ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15268873.) filed by Jarvis J Masters. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Williams, Erica) (Filed on 12/3/2020)
December 2, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jarvis J Masters (Williams, Michael) (Filed on 12/2/2020)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge Lucy H. Koh no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 12/2/20. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2020)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order of Recusal. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/1/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2020)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 12/1/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2020)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting #7 Application. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2020)
November 30, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Michael F. Williams ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15252759.) filed by Jarvis J Masters. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Williams, Michael) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 23, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jarvis J Masters (Littlefield, Ashley) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/7/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Austin L. Klar (Klar, Austin) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
November 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Elizabeth Littlefield (Littlefield, Ashley) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
November 20, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Jarvis J Masters (Littlefield, Ashley) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 0971-15224541.). Filed byJarvis J Masters. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Littlefield, Ashley) (Filed on 11/20/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Masters v. Broomfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jarvis J Masters
Represented By: Ashley Elizabeth Littlefield
Represented By: Austin L. Klar
Represented By: Erica Y. Williams
Represented By: Michael F. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Acting Warden, Calif Ron Broomfield
Represented By: Alice Bemis Lustre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Habeas Capital Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: California Appellate Project
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?