Emerson v. Iron Mountain Information Management Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Emerson
Defendant: Iron Mountain Information Management Services, Inc. and Iron Mountain Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2020cv08607
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/29/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 25, 2021 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Initial Case Management Conference held on 1/25/2021. Case referred to ADR for Court mediation to be completed by 4/25/2021. Case Management Statement due by 9/27/2021. Close of Expert Discovery due by 1/14/2022. Close of Fact Discovery due by 10/2/2022. Daubert/Dispositive Motions due by 12/14/2021. Opening Reports due by 11/1/2021. Rebuttal Reports due by 11/22/2021. Joint Statement re pretrial compliance deadline due by 4/1/2022. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/4/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. Jury Selection set for 5/2/2022 08:30 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. [JURY SELECTION WILL BE HELD IN THE WEEK PRIOR TO THE JURY TRIAL DATE.]Jury Trial set for 5/2/2022 08:30 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Daubert/Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Joint Pretrial Conference Statement filed by 4/1/2022.Pretrial Conference set for 4/15/2022 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Compliance deadline re pretrial preparation set for 3/25/2022 09:01 AM. Total Time in Court: 17 minutes. Court Reporter: Raynee Mercado. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/25/2021)
January 22, 2021 Filing 17 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING FOR THE Initial Case Management Conference set for MONDAY, 1/25/2021 02:00 PM VIA ZOOM WEBINAR Videoconference. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr Please click the link below to join webinar (public hearings). If you are a case participant, you will join as an attendee, then you will be brought into the proceeding by court staff.https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1618764848?pwd=bW03Y2NvV0YrK2FQSkxoMXRxOWprQT09Webinar ID: 161 876 4848Password: 715550Local telephone dial-in:US: +1 (669) 254-5252 or +1 (646) 828-7666General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . Initial Case Management Conference set for MONDAY, 1/25/2021 02:00 PM via ZOOM WEBINAR Videoconference. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 16 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Iron Mountain Incorporated, Iron Mountain Information Management Services, Inc. and Kimberly Emerson. (Baarts, Nicole) (Filed on 1/20/2021) Modified on 1/21/2021 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2021 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kimberly Emerson (Vaznaugh, Richard) (Filed on 1/14/2021)
January 14, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Iron Mountain Incorporated, Iron Mountain Information Management Services, Inc. and Kimberly Emerson filed by Iron Mountain Incorporated, Iron Mountain Information Management Services, Inc.. (Baarts, Nicole) (Filed on 1/14/2021)
December 23, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Iron Mountain Incorporated, Iron Mountain Information Management Services, Inc. (Ovrahim, Youlet) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/18/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for Monday, 1/25/2021 02:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers via Zoom Webinar Videoconference. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)Zoom link information will be posted on the docket in advance of the hearing. Zoom link information is also on the Judge's page on the court website www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/gonzalez-rogers-yvonne-ygr/ (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 12/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 17, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 17, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Iron Mountain Incorporated, Iron Mountain Information Management Services, Inc... (Baarts, Nicole) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 7, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Iron Mountain Incorporated, Iron Mountain Information Management Services, Inc. (Ovrahim, Youlet) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
December 7, 2020 Filing 7 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Iron Mountain Information Management Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Iron Mountain Incorporated for Iron Mountain Information Management Services, Inc.. (Baarts, Nicole) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
December 7, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Iron Mountain Information Management Services, Inc. (Baarts, Nicole) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
December 7, 2020 Filing 5 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Iron Mountain Incorporated (Baarts, Nicole) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
December 7, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Iron Mountain Incorporated (Baarts, Nicole) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 3/10/202 1. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
December 7, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/21/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
December 7, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Each Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Parties Must be Filed Separately Using the Correct Event. This filing will not be proce ssed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety Only Re: #1 -8-11 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Iron Mountain Information Management Services, Inc., Iron Mountain Incorporated. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
December 4, 2020 #1 Answer to Removal Complaint by Iron Mountain Incorporated, Iron Mountain Information Management Services, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2020)
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (jury demand by plaintiff) from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG20077156. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-15277767). Filed by Iron Mountain Incorporated, Iron Mountain Information Management Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Declaration of Nicole Baarts, #6 Declaration of Steven James, #7 Declaration of Kelly Ciano, #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement for Iron Mountain Information Management Systems, Inc., #9 Corporate Disclosure Statement for Iron Mountain Incorporated, #10 Certificate of Interested Parties for Iron Mountain Information Management Systems, Inc., #11 Certificate of Interested Parties for Iron Mountain Incorporated, #12 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Bolson Baarts, Nicole) (Filed on 12/4/2020) Modified on 12/7/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emerson v. Iron Mountain Information Management Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iron Mountain Information Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole A. Baarts
Represented By: Youlet Ovrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iron Mountain Incorporated
Represented By: Nicole A. Baarts
Represented By: Youlet Ovrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Emerson
Represented By: Richard J. Vaznaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?