Nicholson et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bobby Cobb, Alvin Lemuel Monroe, Marian S. Carrillo, Vanessa M. Lazard, Michael A. Gonzales, Willie E. Clark, Sr., Carol Jean Hayes, Monell L. Petties, Brian John Haug, Carrie Robinson, Ruben Nerio, Allen T. Williams, Andre Adams, Stewart W. Johnson, Hiram Mathews, Darrien M. Tilmon, Tracie Green, Donald Russell, Tonia A. Jones, Robert R. Smith, Jr., Audra Satterwhite, Michelle R. McKelvey, Gerald J. Beasley, Frank Rebelo-Miholer, Earline Ramsey, Robert Reese, Georgia M. Henderson, Vincent Carbone, Terrell Thurmond, Sr., Willis Murray, Daniel G. Westrick, Sandra D. McCoy-Jacobs, Gregory Rivera Ortiz, Sharon D. Parks, Dannis L. Sweek, Joe E. Moore, Charles Otis Jones, Elliot Williams, Arthur Pickens, Allen Nicholson, Jr., Phillip Anthony Dunbar, Rodney L. Thompson, Vanessa L. Brown, Steven Dornbusch, Frederick D. North, Tracy D. Lafferty, Jeffrey R. Williams, Antoine M. Kyle, Bobby J. Vice, Dennis D. Fielitz and Gretchen Laslie
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv08751
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Regarding Dismissal of Claims and Responsive Pleadings by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (509) Stipulation in case 4:18-cv-06972-JST; granting (10) Stipulation in case 4:20-cv-08751-JST. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Dismissal of Claims and Responsive Pleadings filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc. and Allen Nicholson, Jr.. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 12/22/2020) Modified on 12/23/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR PRETRIAL PURPOSES by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (507) Stipulation in case 4:18-cv-06972-JST; granting (8) Stipulation in case 4:20-cv-08751-JST. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Consolidating Cases for Pretrial Purposes filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc. and Alan Nicholson, Jr.. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 12/21/2020) Modified on 12/21/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 12/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RELATING CASE 20-cv-08751-KAW to 4:18-cv-06972-JST. Motions terminated: (502 in 4:18-cv-06972-JST) Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Adrian Holley. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 18, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
December 11, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Monell L. Petties, Michelle R. McKelvey, Frank Rebelo-Miholer, Audra Satterwhite, Gretchen Laslie, Allen T. Williams, Dennis D. Fielitz, Allen Nicholson, Jr, Donald Russell, Marian S. Carrillo, Darrien M. Tilmon, Tonia A. Jones, Gregory Rivera Ortiz, Hiram Mathews, Jeffrey R. Williams, Sharon D. Parks, Elliot Williams, Daniel G. Westrick, Vincent Carbone, Gerald J. Beasley, Brian John Haug, Michael A. Gonzales, Robert Reese, Carol Jean Hayes, Vanessa M. Lazard, Stewart W. Johnson, Frederick D. North, Tracy D. Lafferty, Georgia M. Henderson, Charles Otis Jones, Joe E. Moore, Arthur Pickens, Willie E. Clark, Sr, Sandra D. McCoy-Jacobs, Robert R. Smith, Jr, Alvin Lemuel Monroe, Bobby J. Vice, Willis Murray, Carrie Robinson, Steven Dornbusch, Dannis L. Sweek, Vanessa L. Brown, Bobby Cobb, Ruben Nerio, Andre Adams, Phillip Anthony Dunbar, Rodney L. Thompson, Tracie Green, Terrell Thurmond, Sr, Earline Ramsey, Antoine M. Kyle. Service waived by Gilead Sciences, Inc. waiver sent on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 11, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/9/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/16/2021 01:30 PM. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 11, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Andre Adams, Gerald J. Beasley, Vanessa L. Brown, Vincent Carbone, Marian S. Carrillo, Willie E. Clark, Sr, Bobby Cobb, Steven Dornbusch, Phillip Anthony Dunbar, Dennis D. Fielitz, Michael A. Gonzales, Tracie Green, Brian John Haug, Carol Jean Hayes, Georgia M. Henderson, Stewart W. Johnson, Charles Otis Jones, Tonia A. Jones, Antoine M. Kyle, Tracy D. Lafferty, Gretchen Laslie, Vanessa M. Lazard, Hiram Mathews, Sandra D. McCoy-Jacobs, Michelle R. McKelvey, Alvin Lemuel Monroe, Joe E. Moore, Willis Murray, Ruben Nerio, Allen Nicholson, Jr, Frederick D. North, Gregory Rivera Ortiz, Sharon D. Parks, Monell L. Petties, Arthur Pickens, Earline Ramsey, Frank Rebelo-Miholer, Robert Reese, Carrie Robinson, Donald Russell, Audra Satterwhite, Robert R. Smith, Jr, Dannis L. Sweek, Rodney L. Thompson, Terrell Thurmond, Sr, Darrien M. Tilmon, Bobby J. Vice, Daniel G. Westrick, Allen T. Williams, Elliot Williams, Jeffrey R. Williams (Amended). (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 10, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/24/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
December 10, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect Revision of Civil Cover Sheet used [err201]. Current Revision is JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 10/20). Please complete correct Civil Cover Shee t and e-file an an Amended Civil Cover Sheet only. Event is located at: Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet.Re: #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Brian John Haug, Arthur Pickens, Michelle R. McKelvey, Gerald J. Beasley, Andre Adams, Carrie Robinson, Sandra D. McCoy-Jacobs, Daniel G. Westrick, Charles Otis Jones, Stewart W. Johnson, Tracie Green, Michael A. Gonzales, Bobby Cobb, Dannis L. Sweek, Gretchen Laslie, Allen T. Williams, Willis Murray, Allen Nicholson, Jr., Alvin Lemuel Monroe, Tracy D. Lafferty, Terrell Thurmond, Sr., Darrien M. Tilmon, Ruben Nerio, Earline Ramsey, Carol Jean Hayes, Georgia M. Henderson, Vanessa M. Lazard, Marian S. Carrillo, Vincent Carbone, Donald Russell, Monell L. Petties, Bobby J. Vice, Dennis D. Fielitz, Hiram Mathews, Phillip Anthony Dunbar, Frederick D. North, Robert Reese, Antoine M. Kyle, Frank Rebelo-Miholer, Willie E. Clark, Sr., Gregory Rivera Ortiz, Vanessa L. Brown, Sharon D. Parks, Tonia A. Jones, Rodney L. Thompson, Robert R. Smith, Jr., Steven Dornbusch, Jeffrey R. Williams, Audra Satterwhite, Elliot Williams, Joe E. Moore (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
December 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (No Process) against Gilead Sciences, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15300659.). Filed byMonell L. Petties, Michelle R. McKelvey, Frank Rebelo-Miholer, Audra Satterwhite, Gretchen Laslie, Allen T. Williams, Dennis D. Fielitz, Allen Nicholson, Jr, Donald Russell, Marian S. Carrillo, Darrien M. Tilmon, Tonia A. Jones, Gregory Rivera Ortiz, Hiram Mathews, Jeffrey R. Williams, Sharon D. Parks, Elliot Williams, Daniel G. Westrick, Vincent Carbone, Gerald J. Beasley, Brian John Haug, Michael A. Gonzales, Robert Reese, Carol Jean Hayes, Vanessa M. Lazard, Stewart W. Johnson, Frederick D. North, Tracy D. Lafferty, Georgia M. Henderson, Charles Otis Jones, Joe E. Moore, Arthur Pickens, Willie E. Clark, Sr, Sandra D. McCoy-Jacobs, Robert R. Smith, Jr, Alvin Lemuel Monroe, Bobby J. Vice, Willis Murray, Carrie Robinson, Steven Dornbusch, Dannis L. Sweek, Vanessa L. Brown, Bobby Cobb, Ruben Nerio, Andre Adams, Phillip Anthony Dunbar, Rodney L. Thompson, Tracie Green, Terrell Thurmond, Sr, Earline Ramsey, Antoine M. Kyle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Notice Letter), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 12/10/2020) Modified on 12/11/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nicholson et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Cobb
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Lemuel Monroe
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marian S. Carrillo
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa M. Lazard
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Gonzales
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie E. Clark, Sr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Jean Hayes
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monell L. Petties
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian John Haug
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Robinson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Nerio
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen T. Williams
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Adams
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stewart W. Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hiram Mathews
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrien M. Tilmon
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracie Green
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Russell
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonia A. Jones
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert R. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audra Satterwhite
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle R. McKelvey
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald J. Beasley
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Rebelo-Miholer
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earline Ramsey
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Reese
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia M. Henderson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Carbone
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrell Thurmond, Sr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willis Murray
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel G. Westrick
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra D. McCoy-Jacobs
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Rivera Ortiz
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon D. Parks
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dannis L. Sweek
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe E. Moore
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Otis Jones
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elliot Williams
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Pickens
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Nicholson, Jr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Anthony Dunbar
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney L. Thompson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa L. Brown
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Dornbusch
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick D. North
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy D. Lafferty
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey R. Williams
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine M. Kyle
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby J. Vice
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis D. Fielitz
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gretchen Laslie
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Eugene Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?