American Hospital Association et al v. Department of Health & Human Services et al
Plaintiff: St. Mary's Medical Center, American Hospital Association, Riverside Regional Medical Center, Avera St. Mary's Hospital, 340B Health, American Society of Health-System Pharmacists, Association of American Medical Colleges, America's Essential Hospitals and The Children's Hospital Association
Defendant: Secretary Alex M. Azar, II and Department of Health & Human Services
Petitioner: Novo Nordisk, Inc.
Intervenor Defendant: Eli Lilly and Company, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC and AstraZeneca LP
Case Number: 4:2020cv08806
Filed: December 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2021 Filing 84 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING FOR THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING AND THE Motion Hearing set for 2/9/2021 02:00 PM VIA ZOOM WEBINAR Videoconference before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr Please click the l ink below to join webinar (public hearings). If you are a case participant, you will join as an attendee, then you will be brought into the proceeding by court staff.https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1618764848?pwd=bW03Y2NvV0YrK2FQSkxoMXRxOWprQT09Webinar ID: 161 876 4848Password: 715550Local telephone dial-in:US: +1 (669) 254-5252 or +1 (646) 828-7666General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. OSC and Motion Hearing set for 2/9/2021 02:00 PM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (Related documents(s) #70 , #64 ) (This is a t ext-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2021)
February 2, 2021 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Case division and case location information are incorrect. In the future, please be sure that the case number is correctly reflected on your documents as Oakland Division and the case number should be 4:20-cv-8806 YGR. [err102] Re: #82 Reply to Opposition/Response filed by Department of Health & Human Services, Alex M. Azar, II (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2021)
February 1, 2021 Filing 83 Notice of Supplemental Material re #81 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by340B Health, America's Essential Hospitals, American Hospital Association, American Society of Health-System Pharmacists, Association of American Medical Colleges, Avera St. Mary's Hospital, Riverside Regional Medical Center, St. Mary's Medical Center, The Children's Hospital Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #81 ) (Maul, Anthony) (Filed on 2/1/2021) Modified on 2/2/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
February 1, 2021 Filing 82 REPLY (re #64 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Opposition to Motion for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction ) filed byAlex M. Azar, II, Department of Health & Human Services. (Talmor, Kate) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
January 25, 2021 Filing 81 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by 340B Health, America's Essential Hospitals, American Hospital Association, American Society of Health-System Pharmacists, Association of American Medical Colleges, Avera St. Mary's Hospital, Riverside Regional Medical Center, St. Mary's Medical Center, The Children's Hospital Association. (Maul, Anthony) (Filed on 1/25/2021) Modified on 1/26/2021 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER VACATING ORAL ARGUMENT ON MOTIONS TO INTERVENE AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/20/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #75 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to John D. Shakow. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #74 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Graciela Rodriguez. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #72 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Ashley C. Parrish. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 19, 2021 Filing 76 REPLY (re #28 MOTION to Intervene , #35 MOTION to Intervene , #62 MOTION to Intervene , #38 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ) filed byAstraZeneca LP, Eli Lilly and Company, Novo Nordisk, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Rowen, Matthew) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 19, 2021 Filing 75 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15459238.) filed by Novo Nordisk, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Shakow, John) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 19, 2021 Filing 74 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15459185.) filed by Novo Nordisk, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Rodriguez, Graciela) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #69 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Diana M. Watral. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 19, 2021 Filing 72 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15458996.) filed by Novo Nordisk, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Parrish, Ashley) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 19, 2021 Filing 71 NOTICE by Novo Nordisk, Inc. re #62 MOTION to Intervene Notice of Hearing Date (Nero, Suzanne) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 13, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to: #64 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Opposition to Motion for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction: Responses due by 1/25/2021. Replies due by 2/1/2021. Motion Hearing set for 2/9/2021 02:00 PM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2021)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. Order to Show Cause Hearing and the pending Motion to Dismiss are set for Tuesday, 2/9/2021 02:00 PM via Zoom Webinar. Show Cause Response due by 1/25/2021. Reply filed 2/1/2021. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/13/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 69 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15414736.) Filing fee previously paid on 1/7/2021 filed by Eli Lilly and Company. (Watral, Diana) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #31 Administrative Motion for Proposed Intervenor-Defendant to Exceed Page Limit. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #8 Administrative Motion to Exceed Page Limit. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 66 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #28 MOTION to Intervene , #35 MOTION to Intervene , #62 MOTION to Intervene , #38 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ) filed by340B Health, America's Essential Hospitals, American Hospital Association, American Society of Health-System Pharmacists, Association of American Medical Colleges, Avera St. Mary's Hospital, Riverside Regional Medical Center, St. Mary's Medical Center, The Children's Hospital Association. (Maul, Anthony) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 65 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #28 MOTION to Intervene , #35 MOTION to Intervene , #62 MOTION to Intervene , #38 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ) filed byAlex M. Azar, II, Department of Health & Human Services. (Talmor, Kate) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 64 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Opposition to Motion for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction filed by Alex M. Azar, II, Department of Health & Human Services. Motion Hearing set for 2/23/2021 01:00 PM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 1/25/2021. Replies due by 2/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Talmor, Kate) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Kate Talmor (Talmor, Kate) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 10, 2021 Filing 62 MOTION to Intervene filed by Novo Nordisk, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 1/25/2021. Replies due by 2/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Suzanne E. Nero, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Proposed Order Granting Novo Nordisk Inc.'s Motion to Intervene, #11 Notice of Motion, Motion, and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for an Injunction, #12 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunction and Granting Novo Nordisk Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss)(Nero, Suzanne) (Filed on 1/10/2021)
January 10, 2021 Filing 61 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Novo Nordisk, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Novo Nordisk US Commercial Holdings, Inc. for Novo Nordisk, Inc.. (Nero, Suzanne) (Filed on 1/10/2021)
January 10, 2021 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance on behalf of Novo Nordisk Inc. by Suzanne Elizabeth Nero. (Nero, Suzanne) (Filed on 1/10/2021) Modified on 1/11/2021 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2021 Filing 59 ***RE-FILED AT DOCKET NO. #69 *** MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15414736.) filed by Eli Lilly and Company. (Watral, Diana) (Filed on 1/7/2021) Modified on 1/12/2021 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #47 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Toni-Ann Citera. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #46 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Megan Lacy Owen. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #45 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Brett A. Shumate. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #44 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Rajeev Muttreja. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jeffrey L. Handwerker. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #42 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Allon Kedem. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #41 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Susan L. Pei. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #40 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen K. Wirth. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew A. Kassof. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to John C. O'Quinn. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER [**AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT **] GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PENDING AND ANTICIPATED MOTIONS. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 2/23/2021 01:00 PM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/4/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
December 30, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15382909.) filed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Citera, Toni-Ann) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 30, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15382727.) filed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Owen, Megan) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 30, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15382599.) filed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Shumate, Brett) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 30, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15382552.) filed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Muttreja, Rajeev) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 29, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15377378.) filed by AstraZeneca LP. (Handwerker, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 29, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15376066.) filed by AstraZeneca LP. (Kedem, Allon) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 29, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15376049.) filed by AstraZeneca LP. (Pei, Sally) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 29, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15376037.) filed by AstraZeneca LP. (Wirth, Stephen) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 39 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Seidel, David) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/2/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 1/11/2021. Replies due by 1/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Seidel, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B (Motion to Dismiss), #4 Exhibit C (Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss), #5 Proposed Order)(Seidel, David) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 37 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by AstraZeneca LP identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for AstraZeneca LP. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 36 Certificate of Interested Entities by AstraZeneca LP (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION to Intervene filed by AstraZeneca LP. Motion Hearing set for 2/2/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 1/11/2021. Replies due by 1/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting AstraZeneca's Intervention Motion, #2 Notice of Motion, Motion, and Memorandum in support of Motion to Dismiss and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunction, #3 Declaration of Stephen K. Wirth, #4 Exhibit A to Wirth Decl., #5 Exhibit B to Wirth Decl., #6 Exhibit C to Wirth Decl., #7 Exhibit D to Wirth Decl., #8 Exhibit E to Wirth Decl., #9 Exhibit F to Wirth Decl., #10 Exhibit G to Wirth Decl., #11 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunction and Granting AstraZeneca's Motion to Dismiss)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon D. Mayo on behalf of AstraZeneca LP (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Eli Lilly and Company ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15373254.) filed by Eli Lilly and Company. (Kassof, Andrew) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Eli Lilly and Company ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15373234.) filed by Eli Lilly and Company. (O'Quinn, John) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 31 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Exceed Page Limit in Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Opposition to Motion for Injunction [Dkt 28-2] filed by Eli Lilly and Company. Responses due by 1/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Rowen, #2 Proposed Order)(Rowen, Matthew) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 30 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Eli Lilly and Company (Rowen, Matthew) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 29 Certificate of Interested Entities by Eli Lilly and Company (Rowen, Matthew) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Intervene filed by Eli Lilly and Company. Motion Hearing set for 2/2/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 1/11/2021. Replies due by 1/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Motion to Intervene, #2 Motion to Dismiss and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunction, and Memo in Support, #3 Exhibit 1 - Tally Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 - HRSA 340B Database Export Avera St. Marys, #5 Exhibit 3 - HRSA 340B Database Export - Riverside Hospital, #6 Exhibit 4 - HRSA 340B Database Export - St. Mary's Medical Center, #7 Proposed Order on Motion to Dismiss)(Rowen, Matthew) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. Rowen on behalf of Eli Lilly and Company (Rowen, Matthew) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Edward McKane on behalf of Eli Lilly and Company (McKane, Mark) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule for Pending and Anticipated Motions re #21 Renotice motion hearing, #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by 340B Health, America's Essential Hospitals, American Hospital Association, American Society of Health-System Pharmacists, Association of American Medical Colleges, Avera St. Mary's Hospital, Riverside Regional Medical Center, St. Mary's Medical Center, The Children's Hospital Association, and Department of Health of Human Services. (Maul, Anthony) (Filed on 12/28/2020) Modified on 12/28/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2020 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Motion for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction, Notice of Administrative Motion to Exceed Page Limit served on Attorney General William P. Barr on 12/17/2020, filed by 340B Health, America's Essential Hospitals, American Hospital Association, American Society of Health-System Pharmacists, Association of American Medical Colleges, Avera St. Mary's Hospital, Riverside Regional Medical Center, St. Mary's Medical Center, The Children's Hospital Association. (Maul, Anthony) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 22, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2021 02:00 PM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference Only before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Motion for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction, Notice of Administrative Motion to Exceed Page Limit served on Alex M. Azar II on 12/17/2020, filed by 340B Health, America's Essential Hospitals, American Hospital Association, American Society of Health-System Pharmacists, Association of American Medical Colleges, Avera St. Mary's Hospital, Riverside Regional Medical Center, St. Mary's Medical Center, The Children's Hospital Association. (Maul, Anthony) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Motion for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction, Notice of Administrative Motion to Exceed Page Limit served on US Attorney David L. Anderson on 12/15/2020, filed by 340B Health, America's Essential Hospitals, American Hospital Association, American Society of Health-System Pharmacists, Association of American Medical Colleges, Avera St. Mary's Hospital, Riverside Regional Medical Center, St. Mary's Medical Center, The Children's Hospital Association. (Maul, Anthony) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 21 Renotice motion hearing re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by340B Health, America's Essential Hospitals, American Hospital Association, American Society of Health-System Pharmacists, Association of American Medical Colleges, Avera St. Mary's Hospital, Riverside Regional Medical Center, St. Mary's Medical Center, The Children's Hospital Association. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Maul, Anthony) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 12/15/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
December 14, 2020 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
December 14, 2020 Filing 18 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by 340B Health, America's Essential Hospitals, American Hospital Association, American Society of Health-System Pharmacists, Association of American Medical Colleges, Avera St. Mary's Hospital, St. Mary's Medical Center, The Children's Hospital Association.. (Maul, Anthony) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
December 14, 2020 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff(s) shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge before or on 12/21/2020. Note, any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. A form is attached or the forms are also available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Margaret M. Dotzel.(tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Cassandra T.S. Jones.(tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
December 14, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Margaret M. Dotzel ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15313762.) filed by 340B Health, America's Essential Hospitals, American Hospital Association, American Society of Health-System Pharmacists, Association of American Medical Colleges, Avera St. Mary's Hospital, Riverside Regional Medical Center, St. Mary's Medical Center, The Children's Hospital Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Dotzel, Margaret) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
December 14, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15312915.) filed by 340B Health, America's Essential Hospitals, American Hospital Association, American Society of Health-System Pharmacists, Association of American Medical Colleges, Avera St. Mary's Hospital, Riverside Regional Medical Center, St. Mary's Medical Center, The Children's Hospital Association. (Jonas, Cassandra) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
December 14, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
December 11, 2020 Filing 11 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/4/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/11/2021 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE RE WILLIAM B. SCHULTZ: re #6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/11/2020. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (DISREGARD POSTED IN ERROR - SEE CORRECT ORDER DOCKET NO.10) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re William B. Schultz. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2020) Modified on 12/11/2020 (rmm2S, COURT STAFF).
December 11, 2020 Filing 8 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION For Leave to Exceed Page Limit re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by 340B Health, America's Essential Hospitals, American Hospital Association, American Society of Health-System Pharmacists, Association of American Medical Colleges, Avera St. Mary's Hospital, Riverside Regional Medical Center, St. Mary's Medical Center, The Children's Hospital Association. Responses due by 12/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Maul, Anthony) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 11, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by 340B Health, America's Essential Hospitals, American Hospital Association, American Society of Health-System Pharmacists, Association of American Medical Colleges, Avera St. Mary's Hospital, Riverside Regional Medical Center, St. Mary's Medical Center, The Children's Hospital Association. Responses due by 12/28/2020. Replies due by 1/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mikel Holland, MD, #2 Declaration of Cindy Williams, #3 Declaration of Todd Strumwasser, #4 Proposed Order)(Maul, Anthony) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 11, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15308652.) filed by 340B Health, America's Essential Hospitals, American Hospital Association, American Society of Health-System Pharmacists, Association of American Medical Colleges, Avera St. Mary's Hospital. (Schultz, William) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 11, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/28/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 11, 2020 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet by 340B Health, America's Essential Hospitals, American Hospital Association, American Society of Health-System Pharmacists, Association of American Medical Colleges, Avera St. Mary's Hospital, Riverside Regional Medical Center, St. Mary's Medical Center, The Children's Hospital Association Re: #1 Complaint. (Maul, Anthony) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 11, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 340B Health, America's Essential Hospitals, American Hospital Association, American Society of Health-System Pharmacists, Association of American Medical Colleges, Avera St. Mary's Hospital, Riverside Regional Medical Center, St. Mary's Medical Center, The Children's Hospital Association (Maul, Anthony) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 11, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Please resubmit the current Civil Cover Sheet Rev 10/2020. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civ il Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #1 Complaint, filed by 340B Health, Riverside Regional Medical Center, The Children's Hospital Association, Association of American Medical Colleges, St. Mary's Medical Center, Avera St. Mary's Hospital, America's Essential Hospitals, American Hospital Association, American Society of Health-System Pharmacists (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 11, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Maul, Anthony) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15307534.). Filed byAmerican Society of Health-System Pharmacists, America's Essential Hospitals, Avera St. Mary's Hospital, St. Mary's Medical Center, 340B Health, Riverside Regional Medical Center, American Hospital Association, Association of American Medical Colleges, The Children's Hospital Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Maul, Anthony) (Filed on 12/11/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Hospital Association et al v. Department of Health & Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Alex M. Azar, II
Represented By: Kate Talmor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Health & Human Services
Represented By: Kate Talmor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Mary's Medical Center
Represented By: Anthony F. Maul
Represented By: Cassandra Trombley-Shapir Jonas
Represented By: Margaret M Dotzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Hospital Association
Represented By: Anthony F. Maul
Represented By: William B. Schultz
Represented By: Cassandra Trombley-Shapir Jonas
Represented By: Margaret M Dotzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riverside Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Anthony F. Maul
Represented By: Cassandra Trombley-Shapir Jonas
Represented By: Margaret M Dotzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avera St. Mary's Hospital
Represented By: Anthony F. Maul
Represented By: William B. Schultz
Represented By: Cassandra Trombley-Shapir Jonas
Represented By: Margaret M Dotzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 340B Health
Represented By: Anthony F. Maul
Represented By: William B. Schultz
Represented By: Cassandra Trombley-Shapir Jonas
Represented By: Margaret M Dotzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Society of Health-System Pharmacists
Represented By: Anthony F. Maul
Represented By: William B. Schultz
Represented By: Cassandra Trombley-Shapir Jonas
Represented By: Margaret M Dotzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Association of American Medical Colleges
Represented By: Anthony F. Maul
Represented By: William B. Schultz
Represented By: Cassandra Trombley-Shapir Jonas
Represented By: Margaret M Dotzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: America's Essential Hospitals
Represented By: Anthony F. Maul
Represented By: William B. Schultz
Represented By: Cassandra Trombley-Shapir Jonas
Represented By: Margaret M Dotzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Children's Hospital Association
Represented By: Anthony F. Maul
Represented By: Cassandra Trombley-Shapir Jonas
Represented By: Margaret M Dotzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Novo Nordisk, Inc.
Represented By: Suzanne Elizabeth Nero
Represented By: John D Shakow
Represented By: Ashley C. Parrish
Represented By: Graciela M Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Eli Lilly and Company
Represented By: Andrew A. Kassof
Represented By: Diana Marie Watral
Represented By: John C. O'Quinn
Represented By: Matthew D. Rowen
Represented By: Mark Edward McKane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Megan Lacy Owen
Represented By: Rajeev Muttreja
Represented By: Brett A. Shumate
Represented By: Toni-Ann Citera
Represented By: David H. Seidel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: AstraZeneca LP
Represented By: Stephen K. Wirth
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Allon Kedem
Represented By: Jeffrey Lawrence Handwerker
Represented By: Sally L. Pei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?