PORATH v. Office Depot, Inc.
Plaintiff: James Porath
Defendant: Office Depot, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020mc80089
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE Acknowledging Receipt of Case Transfer in from the Southern District of Florida, No. 0:20-mc-60435-AHS. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 21, 2020 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 0:20-mc-60435. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TRANSFERRING VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA denying as moot #8 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 5/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (yha)
May 14, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Supplemental Authority re #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District,, by JAMES PORATH (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Owens, Scott)
April 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Office Depot, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Objections to Plaintiff, James Poraths January 27, 2020 Subpoena to Produce documents) (Davis, Catherine)
April 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Catherine Logan Davis on behalf of Office Depot, Inc.. Attorney Catherine Logan Davis added to party Office Depot, Inc.(pty:dft). (Davis, Catherine)
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Default Judgment by JAMES PORATH. (Owens, Scott)
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 Clerks Non-Entry of Default as to Office Depot, Inc. - Motions Terminated: #6 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default. Reason: Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed OR Waiver of Service Executed - has NOT been entered on docket. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 4/1/2020. (pes)
March 30, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Office Depot, Inc. by JAMES PORATH. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Todd Logan)(Owens, Scott)
March 28, 2020 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District,, filed by JAMES PORATH. (Owens, Scott)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING PLAINTIFFS MOTION DE #1 TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE VALLE, Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (jao)
February 28, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. MC type cases do not require summons(es) (jbs)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal (jbs)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 Plaintiff's Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena to Enforce from Another District or, in the Alternative, to Transfer to Northern District of California Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45(f). Filing fee $47.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12523695, filed by JAMES PORATH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit 1 | Class Action Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2 | Scheduling Order, #5 Exhibit 3 | Plaintiff's Proposal, #6 Exhibit 4 | Order Regarding Class Notice, #7 Exhibit 5 | Plaintiff's Status Report, #8 Exhibit 6 | Subpoena to Office Depot, #9 Exhibit 7 | Office Depot Objections)(Owens, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PORATH v. Office Depot, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office Depot, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine Logan Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Porath
Represented By: Scott David Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?