Rumble, Inc. v. Google LLC et al
Plaintiff: Rumble, Inc.
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive and Google LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00229
Filed: January 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER DENYING #32 MOTION TO DISMISS AND TO STRIKE.Case Management Statement due by 8/23/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/30/2022 02:00 PM. The August 23rd proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 7/29/2022. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2022)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Allan William Jansen for Rumble, Inc. (Jansen, Allan) (Filed on 7/13/2022)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Attorney Allan W. Jansen needs to update profile in the ECF account as the current docket shows an inactive account with the email address ajansen 4;sheppardmullin.com (Inactive). This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #56 Notice of Appearance filed by Rumble, Inc. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2022)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE of Change of Address by John Edward Schmidtlein for counsel for Defendant Google LLC (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 5/3/2022)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/9/2021 before Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2021)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Robert William Dickerson (Dickerson, Robert) (Filed on 10/21/2021)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Transcript of Proceedings held on September 9, 2021, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, telephone number 510-565-7228, cacsr8258@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #49 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2021. (Related document(s) #49 ) (rhm) (Filed on 9/29/2021)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/09/2021 before Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr by Google LLC, for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 9/10/2021)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/9/2021 before Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr by Rumble, Inc., for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Dickerson, Robert) (Filed on 9/10/2021)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr: Telephonic Motion Hearing held and Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference NOT held on 9/9/2021.Total Time in Court: 40 minutes. Court Reporter: Raynee Mercado. Plaintiff Attorney: Jack Stern and Robert Dickerson. Defendant Attorney: John Schmidtlein. The motion to strike and motion to dismiss (docket no. #32 ) are argued and submitted by the parties and taken under submission by the Court. Written order to issue. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/9/2021)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 * DUPLICATE - See [47-1] * Proposed Order re #47 Joint Case Management Statement /Proposed Scheduling Order by Rumble, Inc. (Dickerson, Robert) (Filed on 9/2/2021) Modified on 9/3/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Rumble, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Dickerson, Robert) (Filed on 9/2/2021)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Certificate of Interested Entities by Rumble, Inc. (Dickerson, Robert) (Filed on 8/26/2021)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 REPLY (re #32 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Strike #21 Amended Complaint ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 PLAINTIFF RUMBLE, INC.S CORRECTED OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLCS PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE (DKT. 32) by Rumble, Inc.. Amendment to #41 Opposition/Response to Motion . (Dickerson, Robert) (Filed on 7/20/2021) Modified on 7/21/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #42 Stipulation REGARDING CASE DEADLINES. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2021)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING CASE DEADLINES filed by Google LLC and Rumble, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein)(Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 7/19/2021) Modified on 7/20/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #32 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Strike #21 Amended Complaint ) filed byRumble, Inc.. (Dickerson, Robert) (Filed on 7/14/2021)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Dkt. No. #39 Stipulation regarding Case Deadlines. Defendant shall file its reply in support of its partial motion to dismiss and motion to strike on or before August 13, 2021. The Court CONTINUES the case management conference from June 29, 2021 to September 9, 2021, at 2:00 p.m., to be held along with the hearing on the Dkt. No. #32 motion to dismiss. The Court further DIRECTS the parties to submit a joint case management statement by September 2, 2021. All counsel shall use the following dial-in information to access the call: Dial-In: 888-808-6929; Passcode: 6064255For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2021)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Google LLC and Rumble, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein)(Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 6/21/2021) Modified on 6/22/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip J Iovieno (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/17/2021)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack G. Stern (Stern, Jack) (Filed on 6/17/2021)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas A. Gravante, Jr (Gravante, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/17/2021)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Philip J. Iovieno. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2021)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jack G. Stern. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2021)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #27 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Nicholas A. Gravante, Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2021)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Strike #21 Amended Complaint filed by Google LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 7/14/2021. Replies due by 7/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 6/16/2021)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Dickerson, Robert) (Filed on 6/10/2021)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 6/10/2021)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Philip J. Iovieno ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16033258.) Filing fee previously paid on June 2, 2021 filed by Rumble, Inc.. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Jack G. Stern ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16033239.) Filing fee previously paid on June 2, 2021 filed by Rumble, Inc.. (Stern, Jack) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Nicholas A. Gravante, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16033158.) Filing fee previously paid on June 2, 2021 filed by Rumble, Inc.. (Gravante, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsels (Philip J. Lovieno, Jack G. Stern, Nicholas A Gravante, Jr.) must file their own Pro Hac Vice Application using their own ECF Profiles to appear on the docket. [err102] This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #26 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Philip J. Iovieno ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16033258.) filed by Rumble, Inc., #25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Jack G. Stern ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16033239.) filed by Rumble, Inc., #24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Nicholas A. Gravante, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16033158.) filed by Rumble, Inc. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Philip J. Iovieno ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16033258.) filed by Rumble, Inc.. (Dickerson, Robert) (Filed on 6/2/2021)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ***Re-filed, See Docket No. #28 *** MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Jack G. Stern ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16033239.) filed by Rumble, Inc.. (Dickerson, Robert) (Filed on 6/2/2021) Modified on 6/17/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Nicholas A. Gravante, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16033158.) filed by Rumble, Inc.. (Dickerson, Robert) (Filed on 6/2/2021)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #22 Stipulation Regarding Case Deadlines. Motions due by 6/16/2021 and Responses due by 7/14/2021. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Case Deadlines filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein)(Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 5/13/2021)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Google LLC. Filed by Rumble, Inc.. (Dickerson, Robert) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 5/3/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER (as modified) by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #19 Stipulation Regarding Case Deadlines. Amended Pleadings due by 4/30/2021; Motions due by 5/27/2021; Case Management Statement due by 6/22/2021; and Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/29/2021 02:00 PM. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Case Deadlines filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein)(Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: When filing a motion, the Declaration should be filed as attachment to the motion. They are not to be filed separately. [err102] Cor rected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #17 Declaration in Support, filed by Google LLC (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2021)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Request for Judicial Notice re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Notice of Motion and Partial Motion to Dismiss Complaint: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #17 Declaration in Support, Defendant's Request for Consideration of Documents Incorporated by Reference filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #16 , #17 ) (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 3/12/2021)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein in Support of #16 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Notice of Motion and Partial Motion to Dismiss Complaint: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #16 ) (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 3/12/2021)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Notice of Motion and Partial Motion to Dismiss Complaint: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Google LLC. Motion Hearing set for 6/17/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 3/26/2021. Replies due by 4/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 3/12/2021)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Refund Status re #14 Application for Refund Approved. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2021)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Application for Refund re #1 Complaint, Receipt Number 0971-15424013 by Rumble, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Payment History)(Dickerson, Robert) (Filed on 2/24/2021)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION Regarding Defendant Google LLC's Deadline to Respond to the Complaint filed by Google LLC, and Rumble, Inc.. (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 1/26/2021) Modified on 1/27/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google LLC identifying Corporate Parent XXVI Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc. for Google LLC. (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 1/26/2021)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John Edward Schmidtlein (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 1/26/2021)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rumble, Inc. (Dickerson, Robert) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for April 20, 2021, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by April 13th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:21-cv-00229-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 1/19/21. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Rumble, Inc... (Dickerson, Robert) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Google LLC. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/25/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Dickerson, Robert) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Google LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15424117.). Filed byRumble, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dickerson, Robert) (Filed on 1/11/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rumble, Inc. v. Google LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rumble, Inc.
Represented By: Robert William Dickerson
Represented By: Nicholas A. Gravante, Jr.
Represented By: Allan William Jansen
Represented By: Jack G. Stern
Represented By: Philip J Iovieno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: John Edward Schmidtlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?