Association of Irritated Residents v. U.S. Environmental Protection Agency et al
Plaintiff: Association of Irritated Residents
Defendant: U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew Wheeler and John Busterud
Case Number: 4:2021cv00426
Filed: January 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:7604
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas H. Do (Do, John Thomas) (Filed on 2/11/2021)
February 9, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Association of Irritated Residents Corrected Certificate of Service (Newell, Brent) (Filed on 2/9/2021)
February 9, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Association of Irritated Residents Corrected Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Newell, Brent) (Filed on 2/9/2021)
February 9, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Association of Irritated Residents re #11 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (Newell, Brent) (Filed on 2/9/2021)
February 2, 2021 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/27/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/4/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2021)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 2/2/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2021)
February 1, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
February 1, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Association of Irritated Residents.. (Newell, Brent) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
January 30, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Association of Irritated Residents (Newell, Brent) (Filed on 1/30/2021)
January 23, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Association of Irritated Residents. Association of Irritated Residents served on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/22/2021. (Newell, Brent) (Filed on 1/23/2021)
January 23, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Association of Irritated Residents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Newell, Brent) (Filed on 1/23/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to John Busterud, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew Wheeler, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/16/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/23/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 19, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/2/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 17, 2021 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Association of Irritated Residents (Newell, Brent) (Filed on 1/17/2021)
January 17, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Newell, Brent) (Filed on 1/17/2021)
January 17, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Association of Irritated Residents . (Newell, Brent) (Filed on 1/17/2021)
January 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15454861.). Filed byAssociation of Irritated Residents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Newell, Brent) (Filed on 1/17/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Association of Irritated Residents v. U.S. Environmental Protection Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Association of Irritated Residents
Represented By: Brent Joseph Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: John Thomas H. Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Busterud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?