Kaikkonen v. Alaska Air Group et al
Plaintiff: Ashley Kaikkonen
Defendant: Alaska Airlines, Inc., Alaska Air Group, Inc. and Alaska Air Group
Case Number: 4:2021cv00541
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Filing 21 REPLY (re #13 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byAlaska Air Group, Alaska Airlines, Inc.. (Pinkston, Michael) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 20 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #13 MOTION to Dismiss ) CORRECTION OF DOCKET #19 filed byAshley Kaikkonen. (Valerian, Dominic) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 19 ***DISREGARD, RE-FILED AT DOC #20 *** OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #13 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byAshley Kaikkonen. (Halldorsson, Helen) (Filed on 3/5/2021) Modified on 3/8/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alaska Air Group, Alaska Airlines, Inc. of Standing Order for Civil Cases Before District Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. (Pinkston, Michael) (Filed on 2/19/2021)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #16 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2021)
February 18, 2021 Filing 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Ashley Kaikkonen, Alaska Air Group, and Alaska Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Halldorsson, Helen) (Filed on 2/18/2021) Modified on 2/19/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
February 16, 2021 Filing 15 Renotice motion hearing re #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed byAlaska Air Group, Alaska Airlines, Inc.. (Related document(s) #13 ) (Pinkston, Michael) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 16, 2021 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that counsel must re-notice not re-file the #13 motion to dismiss. Hearing date of March 25th, is vacated. The briefing schedule remains in effect. Counsel is directed to check the Court's scheduling notes before re-noticing the motion for a new hearing date. March 25th was not the Court's next available hearing date when this motion was e-filed. If counsel would like to request an earlier date, an administrative motion or a stipulation and proposed order should be filed after the motion is re- noticed. And if granted, the Court will advance the hearing date. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 16, 2021 Set Hearing as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss, See Docket No. #15 : Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2021 02:00 PM before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 12, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Alaska Air Group, Alaska Airlines, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 2/26/2021. Replies due by 3/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Ryan Pinkston, #2 Proposed Order)(Pinkston, Michael) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
February 1, 2021 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ashley Kaikkonen (Halldorsson, Helen) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
February 1, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Ashley Kaikkonen. Service waived by All Defendants. (Halldorsson, Helen) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
January 28, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING TELEPHOINC INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Notice is hereby given that a telephonic case management conference is set for 4/27/2021 at 2:00 PM. A joint case management statement is due by 4/20/2021. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2021)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Judge The Clerk on 1/27/21. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2021)
January 26, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2021)
January 25, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alaska Air Group, Alaska Airlines, Inc. re #6 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, #5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines (Pinkston, Michael) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
January 25, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Alaska Air Group, Alaska Airlines, Inc... (Pinkston, Michael) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
January 25, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/16/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/23/2021 02:00 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
January 22, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/5/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2021)
January 22, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alaska Air Group, Inc., Alaska Airlines, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities (Pinkston, Michael) (Filed on 1/22/2021)
January 22, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alaska Air Group, Inc., Alaska Airlines, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Alaska Air Group, Inc. for Alaska Airlines, Inc.. (Pinkston, Michael) (Filed on 1/22/2021)
January 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG20083458. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-15479190). Filed byAlaska Airlines, Inc., Alaska Air Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Laura E. Crisp, #2 *** Copy of Complaint attached *** - Declaration of M. Ryan Pinkston, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pinkston, Michael) (Filed on 1/22/2021) Modified on 1/25/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaikkonen v. Alaska Air Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Ryan Pinkston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Air Group, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Ryan Pinkston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Air Group
Represented By: Michael Ryan Pinkston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Kaikkonen
Represented By: Xinying Valerian
Represented By: Helen Halldorsson
Represented By: Dominic R. Valerian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?