Clark et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Plaintiff: Anthony Louis Sam, Elaine T. Berrio, Angela T. Mitchell, Edward Robles, Jr., Haywood Cooper, Sander Jenkins, II, Stephanie K. Stackfield, Brian Gerard Cureau, Patricia Diane K. Bailey, Alice Clark, Ronald J. Vaughn, Eddie James Macon, Anthony Burns, Pamela Sue Ebbert, Bridget R. Wright, Michael Wayne Gentry, Stephen Walker, Debra E. Jennings, Eli Thomas, Noreen Ford, John Joseph Compton, Robert E. Hartlein, Kamala Ladawn Russell, Tomaneca Nakeya Young, Larry Scott Stoltz, Frances D. Archie, Tony Michael Perkins, Rita Michelle Brownlee, James A. Walker, Gregory L. Whitton-Cornelius, Robert Henderson, Yolanda M. Mason-Lang, Susan M. Malvasia, Yolanda Morris Kamassa, Solomon E. Ugbaja, Freddie C. Taylor, Avery Dornell Coit, Ronald E. Montgomery, Keith Allan Daniels, Yvonne E. Askew, Cindy Lynn Benedict, Wayne Everett Wendelschafer, Olivia Bonner, Michael Andrew Williams, James Arnold Montney, Steve R. Curry, Robert K. Dillon, Desmond Pagan-Afanador, Carolyn A. Rudolph and Hilliard Martinez Gonzales LLP
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00713
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15734914.) Filing fee previously paid on 3/22/21 filed by Frances D. Archie, Yvonne E. Askew, Patricia Diane K. Bailey, Cindy Lynn Benedict, Elaine T. Berrio, Olivia Bonner, Rita Michelle Brownlee, Anthony Burns, Alice Clark, Avery Dornell Coit, John Joseph Compton, Haywood Cooper, Brian Gerard Cureau, Steve R. Curry, Keith Allan Daniels, Robert K. Dillon, Pamela Sue Ebbert, Noreen Ford, Michael Wayne Gentry, Robert E. Hartlein, Robert Henderson, Sander Jenkins, II, Debra E. Jennings, Yolanda Morris Kamassa, Eddie James Macon, Susan M. Malvasia, Yolanda M. Mason-Lang, Angela T. Mitchell, Ronald E. Montgomery, James Arnold Montney, Desmond Pagan-Afanador, Tony Michael Perkins, Edward Robles, Jr, Carolyn A. Rudolph, Kamala Ladawn Russell, Anthony Louis Sam, Stephanie K. Stackfield, Larry Scott Stoltz, Freddie C. Taylor, Eli Thomas, Solomon E. Ugbaja, Ronald J. Vaughn, James A. Walker, Stephen Walker, Wayne Everett Wendelschafer, Gregory L. Whitton-Cornelius, Michael Andrew Williams, Bridget R. Wright, Tomaneca Nakeya Young. (O'Connor, Benjamin) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 23, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15734645.) Filing fee previously paid on 3/22/21 filed by Frances D. Archie, Yvonne E. Askew, Patricia Diane K. Bailey, Cindy Lynn Benedict, Elaine T. Berrio, Olivia Bonner, Rita Michelle Brownlee, Anthony Burns, Alice Clark, Avery Dornell Coit, John Joseph Compton, Haywood Cooper, Brian Gerard Cureau, Steve R. Curry, Keith Allan Daniels, Robert K. Dillon, Pamela Sue Ebbert, Noreen Ford, Michael Wayne Gentry, Robert E. Hartlein, Robert Henderson, Sander Jenkins, II, Debra E. Jennings, Yolanda Morris Kamassa, Eddie James Macon, Susan M. Malvasia, Yolanda M. Mason-Lang, Angela T. Mitchell, Ronald E. Montgomery, James Arnold Montney, Desmond Pagan-Afanador, Tony Michael Perkins, Edward Robles, Jr, Carolyn A. Rudolph, Kamala Ladawn Russell, Anthony Louis Sam, Stephanie K. Stackfield, Larry Scott Stoltz, Freddie C. Taylor, Eli Thomas, Solomon E. Ugbaja, Ronald J. Vaughn, James A. Walker, Stephen Walker, Wayne Everett Wendelschafer, Gregory L. Whitton-Cornelius, Michael Andrew Williams, Bridget R. Wright, Tomaneca Nakeya Young. (Hilliard, Robert) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 23, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15734778.) Filing fee previously paid on 3/22/21 filed by Frances D. Archie, Yvonne E. Askew, Patricia Diane K. Bailey, Cindy Lynn Benedict, Elaine T. Berrio, Olivia Bonner, Rita Michelle Brownlee, Anthony Burns, Alice Clark, Avery Dornell Coit, John Joseph Compton, Haywood Cooper, Brian Gerard Cureau, Steve R. Curry, Keith Allan Daniels, Robert K. Dillon, Pamela Sue Ebbert, Noreen Ford, Michael Wayne Gentry, Robert E. Hartlein, Robert Henderson, Sander Jenkins, II, Debra E. Jennings, Yolanda Morris Kamassa, Eddie James Macon, Susan M. Malvasia, Yolanda M. Mason-Lang, Angela T. Mitchell, Ronald E. Montgomery, James Arnold Montney, Desmond Pagan-Afanador, Tony Michael Perkins, Edward Robles, Jr, Carolyn A. Rudolph, Kamala Ladawn Russell, Anthony Louis Sam, Stephanie K. Stackfield, Larry Scott Stoltz, Freddie C. Taylor, Eli Thomas, Solomon E. Ugbaja, Ronald J. Vaughn, James A. Walker, Stephen Walker, Wayne Everett Wendelschafer, Gregory L. Whitton-Cornelius, Michael Andrew Williams, Bridget R. Wright, Tomaneca Nakeya Young. (Pixton, R. Allan) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 23, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15735037.) Filing fee previously paid on 03/22/2021 filed by Frances D. Archie, Yvonne E. Askew, Patricia Diane K. Bailey, Cindy Lynn Benedict, Elaine T. Berrio, Olivia Bonner, Rita Michelle Brownlee, Anthony Burns, Alice Clark, Avery Dornell Coit, John Joseph Compton, Haywood Cooper, Brian Gerard Cureau, Steve R. Curry, Keith Allan Daniels, Robert K. Dillon, Pamela Sue Ebbert, Noreen Ford, Michael Wayne Gentry, Robert E. Hartlein, Robert Henderson, Sander Jenkins, II, Debra E. Jennings, Yolanda Morris Kamassa, Eddie James Macon, Susan M. Malvasia, Yolanda M. Mason-Lang, Angela T. Mitchell, Ronald E. Montgomery, James Arnold Montney, Desmond Pagan-Afanador, Tony Michael Perkins, Edward Robles, Jr, Carolyn A. Rudolph, Kamala Ladawn Russell, Anthony Louis Sam, Stephanie K. Stackfield, Larry Scott Stoltz, Freddie C. Taylor, Eli Thomas, Solomon E. Ugbaja, Ronald J. Vaughn, James A. Walker, Stephen Walker, Wayne Everett Wendelschafer, Gregory L. Whitton-Cornelius, Michael Andrew Williams, Bridget R. Wright, Tomaneca Nakeya Young. (Ashley, Katrina) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Katrina R. Ashley.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Benjamin Ryan O'Connor.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to R. Allan Pixton.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Robert C. Hilliard.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15735037.) filed by Hilliard Martinez Gonzales LLP. (Ashley, Katrina) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15734914.) filed by Hilliard Martinez Gonzales LLP. (O'Connor, Benjamin) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15734778.) filed by Hilliard Martinez Gonzales LLP. (Pixton, R. Allan) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15734645.) filed by Hilliard Martinez Gonzales LLP. (Hilliard, Robert) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS AND RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (576) Stipulation in case 4:18-cv-06972-JST; granting (12) Stipulation in case 4:21-cv-00713-JST. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2021) Modified on 2/25/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS AND RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc. and Alice Clark, et al.. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 2/24/2021) Modified on 2/24/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR PRETRIAL PURPOSES by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (570) Stipulation in case 4:18-cv-06972-JST; granting (10) Stipulation in case 4:21-cv-00713-JST. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2021)
February 23, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR PRETRIAL PURPOSES filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc. and Alice Clark, et al.. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 2/23/2021) Modified on 2/24/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.Signed by the Clerk on 2/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2021)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RELATING CASE 21-cv-00713-KAW to 18-cv-06972-JST. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 18, 2021. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2021)
February 17, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Alice Clark. Service waived by Gilead Sciences, Inc. waiver sent on 1/29/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 2/17/2021)
February 17, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021)
February 17, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Frances D. Archie, Yvonne E. Askew, Patricia Diane K. Bailey, Cindy Lynn Benedict, Elaine T. Berrio, Olivia Bonner, Rita Michelle Brownlee, Anthony Burns, Alice Clark, Avery Dornell Coit, John Joseph Compton, Haywood Cooper, Brian Gerard Cureau, Steve R. Curry, Keith Allan Daniels, Robert K. Dillon, Pamela Sue Ebbert, Noreen Ford, Michael Wayne Gentry, Robert E. Hartlein, Robert Henderson, Sander Jenkins, II, Debra E. Jennings, Yolanda Morris Kamassa, Eddie James Macon, Susan M. Malvasia, Yolanda M. Mason-Lang, Angela T. Mitchell, Ronald E. Montgomery, James Arnold Montney, Desmond Pagan-Afanador, Tony Michael Perkins, Edward Robles, Jr, Carolyn A. Rudolph, Kamala Ladawn Russell, Anthony Louis Sam, Stephanie K. Stackfield, Larry Scott Stoltz, Freddie C. Taylor, Eli Thomas, Solomon E. Ugbaja, Ronald J. Vaughn, James A. Walker, Stephen Walker, Wayne Everett Wendelschafer, Gregory L. Whitton-Cornelius, Michael Andrew Williams, Bridget R. Wright, Tomaneca Nakeya Young.. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 2/17/2021)
February 17, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/3/2021. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021)
February 1, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/27/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/4/2021 01:30 PM. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/12/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (No Process) against Gilead Sciences, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15508999.). Filed byRobert Henderson, Rita Michelle Brownlee, James Arnold Montney, Bridget R. Wright, Michael Andrew Williams, Freddie C. Taylor, Angela T. Mitchell, Alice Clark, Gregory L. Whitton-Cornelius, Pamela Sue Ebbert, Frances D. Archie, Tomaneca Nakeya Young, Larry Scott Stoltz, Michael Wayne Gentry, Noreen Ford, Stephanie K. Stackfield, James A. Walker, Elaine T. Berrio, Yvonne E. Askew, Keith Allan Daniels, Cindy Lynn Benedict, Patricia Diane K. Bailey, Robert K. Dillon, Debra E. Jennings, Yolanda Morris Kamassa, John Joseph Compton, Steve R. Curry, Wayne Everett Wendelschafer, Kamala Ladawn Russell, Eddie James Macon, Olivia Bonner, Brian Gerard Cureau, Solomon E. Ugbaja, Anthony Burns, Ronald E. Montgomery, Carolyn A. Rudolph, Stephen Walker, Desmond Pagan-Afanador, Eli Thomas, Yolanda M. Mason-Lang, Edward Robles, Jr, Sander Jenkins, II, Anthony Louis Sam, Robert E. Hartlein, Ronald J. Vaughn, Tony Michael Perkins, Haywood Cooper, Susan M. Malvasia, Avery Dornell Coit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 1/29/2021) Modified on 2/1/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Louis Sam
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine T. Berrio
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela T. Mitchell
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Robles, Jr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haywood Cooper
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sander Jenkins, II
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie K. Stackfield
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Gerard Cureau
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Diane K. Bailey
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Clark
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald J. Vaughn
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie James Macon
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Burns
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Sue Ebbert
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridget R. Wright
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wayne Gentry
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Walker
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra E. Jennings
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eli Thomas
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noreen Ford
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Joseph Compton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. Hartlein
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamala Ladawn Russell
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomaneca Nakeya Young
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Scott Stoltz
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances D. Archie
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Michael Perkins
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Michelle Brownlee
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A. Walker
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory L. Whitton-Cornelius
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Henderson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda M. Mason-Lang
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan M. Malvasia
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Morris Kamassa
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solomon E. Ugbaja
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie C. Taylor
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avery Dornell Coit
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald E. Montgomery
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Allan Daniels
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne E. Askew
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Lynn Benedict
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Everett Wendelschafer
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia Bonner
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Andrew Williams
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Arnold Montney
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve R. Curry
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert K. Dillon
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desmond Pagan-Afanador
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn A. Rudolph
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilliard Martinez Gonzales LLP
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Eugene Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?