Wu v. Joyce et al
Plaintiff: Grace Wu and Greta Wu
Defendant: Konigsberg Joyce, 1823 Willow Pass LLC and Joyce Konigsberg
Case Number: 4:2021cv01134
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1365
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2021 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Entities by 1823 Willow Pass LLC, Joyce Konigsberg (Abdelnour, Samir) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
April 12, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by1823 Willow Pass LLC, Joyce Konigsberg. (Abdelnour, Samir) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
April 12, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Samir J. Abdelnour (Abdelnour, Samir) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
March 29, 2021 Filing 15 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING re #1 Complaint, filed by Greta Wu, Joyce Konigsberg, 1823 Willow Pass LLC. (Wick, William) (Filed on 3/29/2021) Modified on 3/30/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Greta Wu re #12 Summons Issued Proof of Service of Summons (re Joyce Konigsberg for 1823 Willow Pass LLC) (Wick, William) (Filed on 3/16/2021)
March 16, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Greta Wu re #11 Summons Issued Proof of Service of Summons (re Joyce Konigsberg) (Wick, William) (Filed on 3/16/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to 1823 Willow Pass LLC. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Joyce Konigsberg. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. (Wick, William) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. (Wick, William) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 2, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlin Brigitte Wiley-Walker as Counsel for Plaintiff Greta Wu, Trustee on Behalf of the Wu Survivor's Trust (Wiley-Walker, Caitlin) (Filed on 3/2/2021)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/13/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/20/2021 at 02:00 PM - Videoconference Only. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/2/2021. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2021)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 3/2/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2021)
March 1, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2021)
March 1, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Greta Wu.. (Wick, William) (Filed on 3/1/2021)
February 17, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/12/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021)
February 16, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/2/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; with Jury Demand against 1823 Willow Pass LLC, Konigsberg Joyce ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15580423). Filed by Grace Wu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wick, William) (Filed on 2/16/2021) Modified on 2/17/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/5/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wu v. Joyce et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Konigsberg Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1823 Willow Pass LLC
Represented By: Samir J. Abdelnour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Konigsberg
Represented By: Samir J. Abdelnour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Wu
Represented By: William David Wick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greta Wu
Represented By: William David Wick
Represented By: Anna Le Nguyen
Represented By: Caitlin Brigitte Wiley-Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?