Lowe v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Kiesha Lowe
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv01144
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2021 Filing 26 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 5/17/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for Monday, 5/24/2021 02:00 PM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)Zoom link information will be posted on the docket in advance of the hearing. Zoom link information is also on the Judge's page on the court website www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/gonzalez-rogers-yvonne-ygr/ (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2021)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Kristen L. Cardoso. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2021)
March 12, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by John Samuel Gibson [for Defendant Apple Inc.] (Gibson, John) (Filed on 3/12/2021)
March 12, 2021 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER: Case division and case location information are incorrect. In the future, please be sure that the case number is correctly reflected on your documents as Oakland Division and the case number should be 4:21-cv-1144 YGR. [err102] Re: #23 Stipulation filed by Apple Inc. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2021)
March 11, 2021 Filing 23 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint Pending Resolution of Motion to Transfer filed by Apple Inc., Kiesha Lowe. (Kim, Brooke) (Filed on 3/11/2021) Modified on 3/12/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Kristen L. Cardoso. ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15675720.) filed by Kiesha Lowe. (Cardoso, Kristen) (Filed on 3/9/2021) Modified on 3/10/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2021 Filing 21 Case REASSIGNED to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Beth Labson Freeman no longer assigned to the case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2021)
March 9, 2021 Filing 20 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2021)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/8/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2021)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case except for Discovery Purposes. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple Inc. (Kim, Brooke) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple Inc... (Kim, Brooke) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
February 24, 2021 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. Defendant is requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 3/10/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2021)
February 23, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kiesha Lowe. Apple Inc. served on 2/18/2021, answer due 3/11/2021. (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 2/23/2021)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #11 Application for Admission of Attorney Jason Alperstein Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiff Keisha Lowe. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2021)
February 19, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15596308.) filed by Kiesha Lowe. (Alperstein, Jason) (Filed on 2/19/2021)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #5 Application for Admission of Attorney Andrea R. Gold Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiff Keisha Lowe. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2021).
February 17, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021)
February 17, 2021 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/12/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021)
February 17, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kiesha Lowe.. (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 2/17/2021)
February 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Hassan Ali Zavareei (Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 2/17/2021)
February 17, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15584491.) filed by Kiesha Lowe. (Attachments: #1 DC Certificate of Good Standing)(Gold, Andrea) (Filed on 2/17/2021)
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/2/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kiesha Lowe (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 16, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15582498.). Filed byKiesha Lowe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 2/16/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowe v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Brooke Killian Kim
Represented By: John Samuel Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiesha Lowe
Represented By: Daniel L. Warshaw
Represented By: Kristen Cardoso
Represented By: Hassan Ali Zavareei
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Represented By: Andrea R. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?