Martin v. State Bar of California et al
Plaintiff: Craig Kenneth Martin
Defendant: Sherrie B. McLetchie, Hailyn Chen, Tracie L Brown, Susan M. Chan, Victoria B Hanley, Allen Blumenthal, Alan Steinbrecher, Theodore Eliopoulos, Donald Steedman, Richard Szeto, Robert Henderson, Joanna Mendoza, John W. Matney, Brandon N. Stallings, Lawrence J. Dal Cerro, Gregory F Harley, Russell G. Weiner, State Bar of California, Jason P Lee, Danielle A Lee, Lawrence C Yee, Committee of Bar Examiners, Joshua Perttula, Kevin M Sullivan, Mark Torres-Gil, Michael Scott Keck, Debbie Y Manning, Robert A. Endries, Sonia Delen, Sean T Strauss, Joann M. Remke, Anthony Lincoln, Mark Broughton, Leah T Wilson, John Schifino, Ruben Duran, Griffin & Sullivan, Jon B. Streeter, Mike A Nesperos, Jr, Sean M Selegue, Robert G. Retana, Attorney at Law Lindbergh Porter, Jr., Elizabeth Bailey, Renee Labran, Wonder J. Liang, Patricia McElroy, Vanessa L Holton, Starr Babcock, ILD CORP, Newton N Knowles, Michael Cumpton, Lucy Armendariz and Thomas Anthony Miller
Case Number: 4:2021cv01451
Filed: March 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2021 Filing 92 REPLY (re #85 MOTION to Dismiss ) SUPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER VACATING HEARING re #85 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mark Torres-Gil, Joshua Perttula, Robert A. Endries, Vanessa L Holton, Allen Blumenthal, Robert Henderson, Lawrence J. Dal Cerro, Sean M Selegue, Brandon N. Stallings, Susan M. Chan, Lucy Armendariz, Robert G. Retana, Danielle A Lee, Mark Broughton, Sonia Delen, State Bar of California, Sean T Strauss, Ruben Duran, Newton N Knowles, Hailyn Chen, Committee of Bar Examiners. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 23, 2021. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
April 20, 2021 Filing 90 REPLY (re #85 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed by Lucy Armendariz, Allen Blumenthal, Mark Broughton, Susan M. Chan, Hailyn Chen, Committee of Bar Examiners, Lawrence J. Dal Cerro, Sonia Delen, Ruben Duran, Robert A. Endries, Robert Henderson, Vanessa L Holton, Newton N Knowles, Danielle A Lee, Joshua Perttula, Robert G. Retana, Sean M Selegue, Brandon N. Stallings, State Bar of California, Sean T Strauss, Mark Torres-Gil. (Andresen, Carissa) (Filed on 4/20/2021) Modified on 4/20/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2021 Filing 89 EXHIBITS filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit)(Martin, Craig) (Filed on 4/20/2021)
April 20, 2021 Filing 88 EXHIBITS filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit)(Martin, Craig) (Filed on 4/20/2021)
April 13, 2021 Filing 87 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #85 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 4/13/2021)
March 30, 2021 Filing 86 Request for Judicial Notice re #85 MOTION to Dismiss State Bar Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Request for Judicial Notice in Support of State Bar Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed byLucy Armendariz, Allen Blumenthal, Mark Broughton, Susan M. Chan, Hailyn Chen, Committee of Bar Examiners, Lawrence J. Dal Cerro, Sonia Delen, Ruben Duran, Robert A. Endries, Robert Henderson, Vanessa L Holton, Newton N Knowles, Danielle A Lee, Joshua Perttula, Robert G. Retana, Sean M Selegue, Brandon N. Stallings, State Bar of California, Sean T Strauss, Mark Torres-Gil. (Related document(s) #85 ) (Andresen, Carissa) (Filed on 3/30/2021)
March 30, 2021 Filing 85 Notice of Motion and MOTION to Dismiss Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Lucy Armendariz, Allen Blumenthal, Mark Broughton, Susan M. Chan, Hailyn Chen, Committee of Bar Examiners, Lawrence J. Dal Cerro, Sonia Delen, Ruben Duran, Robert A. Endries, Robert Henderson, Vanessa L Holton, Newton N Knowles, Danielle A Lee, Joshua Perttula, Robert G. Retana, Sean M Selegue, Brandon N. Stallings, State Bar of California, Sean T Strauss, Mark Torres-Gil. Motion Hearing set for 5/6/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 4/13/2021. Replies due by 4/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting State Bar Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint with Prejudice)(Andresen, Carissa) (Filed on 3/30/2021) Modified on 3/30/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2021 #Electronic filing error. It appears that the filings at dockets referenced below may have been audio files. ECF does not accept audio files. Please review the court rules re manua l filings and submit any audio files as manual filings. Re: #65 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #67 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2021)
March 24, 2021 Filing 84 EXHIBITS Exhibit 43 filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
March 24, 2021 Filing 83 EXHIBITS Exhibit 41 filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
March 24, 2021 Filing 82 EXHIBITS Exhibit 39 filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
March 24, 2021 Filing 81 EXHIBITS Exhibit 38 filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
March 24, 2021 Filing 80 EXHIBITS Exhibit 37 filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
March 24, 2021 Filing 79 EXHIBITS Exhibit 36 filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
March 24, 2021 Filing 78 EXHIBITS Exhibit 35 filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
March 24, 2021 Filing 77 EXHIBITS Exhibit 34 filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
March 24, 2021 Filing 76 EXHIBITS Exhibit 33 filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
March 24, 2021 Filing 75 EXHIBITS Exhibit 32 filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
March 24, 2021 Filing 74 EXHIBITS Exhibit 31 filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
March 24, 2021 Filing 73 EXHIBITS Exhibit 28 filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
March 24, 2021 Filing 72 EXHIBITS Exhibit 27 filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
March 24, 2021 Filing 71 EXHIBITS Exhibit 25 filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
March 24, 2021 Filing 70 EXHIBITS Exhibit 24 filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
March 24, 2021 Filing 69 EXHIBITS Exhibit 23 filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
March 24, 2021 Filing 68 EXHIBITS Exhibit 21 filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
March 24, 2021 Filing 67 EXHIBITS Exhibit 20 filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
March 24, 2021 Filing 66 EXHIBITS Exhibit 19 filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
March 24, 2021 Filing 65 EXHIBITS Exhibit 18 filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
March 24, 2021 Filing 64 EXHIBITS Exhibit 17 filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
March 24, 2021 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. E-filer is advised to file the Exhibits as separate attachments to ONE ECF entry instead of filing multiple entries on the docket. No title Page. Exhibits e-filed separately and not as an attachment, require a title page indicating to which document it is an exhibit. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requirement. Please re-file in its entirety linking the filing to the document for which it is an exhibit. Re: #81 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #82 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #79 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #84 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #83 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #80 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
March 24, 2021 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. E-filer is advised to file the Exhibits as separate attachments to ONE ECF entry instead of fil ing multiple entries on the docket. No title Page. Exhibits e-filed separately and not as an attachment, require a title page indicating to which document it is an exhibit. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requirement. Please re-file in its entirety linking the filing to the document for which it is an exhibit. Re: #74 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #71 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #76 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #72 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #69 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #65 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #73 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #66 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #75 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #70 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #68 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #64 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #67 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 63 EXHIBITS Exhibit 16 filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 62 EXHIBITS Exhibit 15 filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 61 EXHIBITS Exhibit 14 filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 60 EXHIBITS Exhibit 12 filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 59 EXHIBITS Exhibit 11 filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 58 EXHIBITS Exhibit 10 filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 57 EXHIBITS Exhibit 9 filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 56 EXHIBITS Exhibit 8 filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 55 EXHIBITS Exhibit 7 filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 54 EXHIBITS Exhibit 6 filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 53 EXHIBITS Exhibit 5 filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 52 EXHIBITS Exhibit 4 filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 51 EXHIBITS Exhibit 3 filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 50 EXHIBITS Exhibit 2 filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 49 EXHIBITS Exhibit 1 filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 22, 2021 #Electronic filing error. No title Page. Exhibits e-filed separately and not as an attachment, require a title page indicating to which document it is an exhibit. Please refer to C ivil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requirement. Please re-file in its entirety linking the filing to the document for which it is an exhibit. Re: #63 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 22, 2021 #Electronic filing error. No title Page. Exhibits e-filed separately and not as an attachment, require a title page indicating to which document it is an exhibit. Please refer to C ivil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requirement. Please re-file in its entirety linking the filing to the document for which it is an exhibit. Re: #56 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #52 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #61 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #49 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #53 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #59 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #51 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #50 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #60 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #55 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #57 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #62 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #58 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #54 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER re #8 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/10/2021. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2021)
March 10, 2021 Filing 47 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 6/1/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/8/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2021)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 3/9/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2021)
March 8, 2021 Filing 45 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2021)
March 8, 2021 Filing 44 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Craig Kenneth Martin.. (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/8/2021)
March 8, 2021 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file the document using the correct event - Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Ma gistrate Judge. The event can be found under the Other Filings/Other Documents category. E-filer is also reminded not to attach a copy of the complaint in future filings. Re: #43 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re 3 Case Assigned by Intake, filed by Craig Kenneth Martin. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 43 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, filed by Craig Kenneth Martin. Responses due by 3/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 #Electronic filing error. E-filer is advised to file the Exhibits as separate attachments to ONE ECF entry instead of filing multiple entries on the docket. Re: #42 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #23 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #29 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #30 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #38 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #27 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #22 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #20 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #36 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #17 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #25 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #24 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #37 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #32 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #28 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #19 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #18 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #14 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #41 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #16 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #31 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #40 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #13 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #15 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #39 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #12 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #26 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #33 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #35 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #34 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin, #21 Exhibits filed by Craig Kenneth Martin. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 42 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 41 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 40 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 39 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 38 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 37 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 36 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 35 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 34 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 33 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 32 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 31 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 30 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 29 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 28 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 27 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 26 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 25 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 24 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 23 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 22 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 21 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 20 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 19 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 18 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 17 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 16 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 15 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 14 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 13 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 12 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Lucy Armendariz, Tracie L Brown, Theodore Eliopoulos, Robert A. Endries, Robert Henderson, ILD CORP, Anthony Lincoln, Patricia McElroy, Sherrie B. McLetchie, Lindbergh Porter, Jr., Joann M. Remke, John Schifino, State Bar of California, Sean T Strauss, Jon B. Streeter, Kevin M Sullivan, Richard Szeto, Mark Torres-Gil, Russell G. Weiner, Leah T Wilson, Lawrence C Yee. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 10 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 9 EXHIBITS re #2 Exhibits filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #2 ) (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 8 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 11-3601. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 3/4/2021. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 7 EXHIBITS re Electronic Filing Error, filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Related document(s)[]) (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 6 FEE PAID (Filing fee$ 402.00.), Receipt No. 44611017068. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2021) (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE Regarding Resources Available to Pro Se Litigants. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/27/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/3/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/18/2021. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 2 Complaint filed by Craig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/4/2021) Modified on 3/4/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Counsel mailed in multiple summons, A maximum of THREE summons will be issued. Please list all defendants on ONE summons or multiple defendants on THREE summons and re-file in its entirety : #1 Complaint filed by Craig Kenneth Martin (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect Revision of Civil Cover Sheet used. Current Revision is JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 10/20) [err101]. Please e-file an Amended Civil Cover Sheet only. Even t is located at: Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #1 Complaint filed by Craig Kenneth Martin (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byCraig Kenneth Martin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin, Craig) (Filed on 3/1/2021)
March 1, 2021 #Electronic filing error.NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT Please be advised that the filing fee has not been received in this case. The fee must be paid within two business days or the case will be subject to termination. Please pay the filing fee through Pay.gov by clicking on Civil > Other Documents > New Case Filing Fee in CM/ECF. [err701] Re: #1 Complaint filed by Craig Kenneth Martin Missing Signature- The Verification on the Complaint was not signed, please sign and refile the amended complaint. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. State Bar of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherrie B. McLetchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hailyn Chen
Represented By: Carissa Noelle Andresen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracie L Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan M. Chan
Represented By: Carissa Noelle Andresen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria B Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Blumenthal
Represented By: Carissa Noelle Andresen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Steinbrecher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore Eliopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Steedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Szeto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Henderson
Represented By: Carissa Noelle Andresen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanna Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Matney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon N. Stallings
Represented By: Carissa Noelle Andresen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence J. Dal Cerro
Represented By: Carissa Noelle Andresen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory F Harley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell G. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Bar of California
Represented By: Carissa Noelle Andresen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason P Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle A Lee
Represented By: Carissa Noelle Andresen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence C Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Committee of Bar Examiners
Represented By: Carissa Noelle Andresen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Perttula
Represented By: Carissa Noelle Andresen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin M Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Torres-Gil
Represented By: Carissa Noelle Andresen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Scott Keck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Y Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Endries
Represented By: Carissa Noelle Andresen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonia Delen
Represented By: Carissa Noelle Andresen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean T Strauss
Represented By: Carissa Noelle Andresen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joann M. Remke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Lincoln
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Broughton
Represented By: Carissa Noelle Andresen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leah T Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Schifino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruben Duran
Represented By: Carissa Noelle Andresen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Griffin & Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon B. Streeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike A Nesperos, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean M Selegue
Represented By: Carissa Noelle Andresen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert G. Retana
Represented By: Carissa Noelle Andresen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney at Law Lindbergh Porter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Labran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wonder J. Liang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanessa L Holton
Represented By: Carissa Noelle Andresen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starr Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ILD CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newton N Knowles
Represented By: Carissa Noelle Andresen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Cumpton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucy Armendariz
Represented By: Carissa Noelle Andresen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Anthony Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Kenneth Martin
Represented By: Craig Kenneth Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?