Woellhart et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Plaintiff: Veronica L. Hoover, Alicia C. Dennard, Timothy Joe Davis, Howard L. Brown, Carrie Estelle Davis, David Christopher Pitts, Kevin Crowell, Nicholas R. Schindler, Nelda J. Moore, Shelia Holmes, David R. Hillard, Richard Arnold Davis, Paul Poore, Gregory Lynn Freeze, Hero Corona, Tracey Kelly, Joann Lynn Blough, David Lawrence Schuller, Joao F. Simoes, Errol Q. Jackson, Katherine J. Grafton, Leslie Oyoumick, David A. Macak, Iris Y. Vasquez, Alan R. Woellhart, Michael J. Sanchez, Keith D. Owens, Milton Epps, Yvonne Louise Thomas, Sean Michael Villasana and Hilliard Martinez Gonzales LLP
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv01499
Filed: March 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Benjamin Ryan O'Connor.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2021)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to R. Allan Pixton.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2021)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Katrina R. Ashley.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2021)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS AND RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (614) Stipulation in case 4:18-cv-06972-JST; granting (18) Stipulation in case 4:21-cv-01282-JST; granting (18) Stipulation in case 4:21-cv-01499-JST. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
March 24, 2021 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. The Certificate of Good Standing has expired. Please re-file in its entirety with an updated certi ficate Re: #16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15734738.) Filing fee previously paid on 3/22/21 filed by Paul Poore, Leslie Oyoumick, Michael J. Sanchez, Iris Y. Vasquez, Errol Q. Jackson, Carrie Estelle Davis, Nicholas R. Schindler, Sean Michael Villasana, Tracey Kelly, Hero Corona, David Christopher Pitts, David Lawrence Schuller, Alan R. Woellhart, Joao F. Simoes, Timothy Joe Davis, Kevin Crowell, Alicia C. Dennard, Gregory Lynn Freeze, Katherine J. Grafton, Nelda J. Moore, Yvonne Louise Thomas, Veronica L. Hoover, Shelia Holmes, David A. Macak, David R. Hillard, Joann Lynn Blough, Richard Arnold Davis, Keith D. Owens, Howard L. Brown, Milton Epps (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
March 23, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS AND RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc. and Allan R. Woellhart. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 3/23/2021) Modified on 3/24/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
March 23, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15734984.) Filing fee previously paid on 3/22/21 filed by Joann Lynn Blough, Howard L. Brown, Hero Corona, Kevin Crowell, Carrie Estelle Davis, Richard Arnold Davis, Timothy Joe Davis, Alicia C. Dennard, Milton Epps, Gregory Lynn Freeze, Katherine J. Grafton, David R. Hillard, Shelia Holmes, Veronica L. Hoover, Errol Q. Jackson, Tracey Kelly, David A. Macak, Nelda J. Moore, Keith D. Owens, Leslie Oyoumick, David Christopher Pitts, Paul Poore, Michael J. Sanchez, Nicholas R. Schindler, David Lawrence Schuller, Joao F. Simoes, Yvonne Louise Thomas, Iris Y. Vasquez, Sean Michael Villasana, Alan R. Woellhart. (O'Connor, Benjamin) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 23, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15734738.) Filing fee previously paid on 3/22/21 filed by Joann Lynn Blough, Howard L. Brown, Hero Corona, Kevin Crowell, Carrie Estelle Davis, Richard Arnold Davis, Timothy Joe Davis, Alicia C. Dennard, Milton Epps, Gregory Lynn Freeze, Katherine J. Grafton, David R. Hillard, Shelia Holmes, Veronica L. Hoover, Errol Q. Jackson, Tracey Kelly, David A. Macak, Nelda J. Moore, Keith D. Owens, Leslie Oyoumick, David Christopher Pitts, Paul Poore, Michael J. Sanchez, Nicholas R. Schindler, David Lawrence Schuller, Joao F. Simoes, Yvonne Louise Thomas, Iris Y. Vasquez, Sean Michael Villasana, Alan R. Woellhart. (Hilliard, Robert) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 23, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15734865.) Filing fee previously paid on 3/22/21 filed by Joann Lynn Blough, Howard L. Brown, Hero Corona, Kevin Crowell, Carrie Estelle Davis, Richard Arnold Davis, Timothy Joe Davis, Alicia C. Dennard, Milton Epps, Gregory Lynn Freeze, Katherine J. Grafton, David R. Hillard, Shelia Holmes, Veronica L. Hoover, Errol Q. Jackson, Tracey Kelly, David A. Macak, Nelda J. Moore, Keith D. Owens, Leslie Oyoumick, David Christopher Pitts, Paul Poore, Michael J. Sanchez, Nicholas R. Schindler, David Lawrence Schuller, Joao F. Simoes, Yvonne Louise Thomas, Iris Y. Vasquez, Sean Michael Villasana, Alan R. Woellhart. (Pixton, R. Allan) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 23, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15735081.) Filing fee previously paid on 3/22/21 filed by Joann Lynn Blough, Howard L. Brown, Hero Corona, Kevin Crowell, Carrie Estelle Davis, Richard Arnold Davis, Timothy Joe Davis, Alicia C. Dennard, Milton Epps, Gregory Lynn Freeze, Katherine J. Grafton, David R. Hillard, Shelia Holmes, Veronica L. Hoover, Errol Q. Jackson, Tracey Kelly, David A. Macak, Nelda J. Moore, Keith D. Owens, Leslie Oyoumick, David Christopher Pitts, Paul Poore, Michael J. Sanchez, Nicholas R. Schindler, David Lawrence Schuller, Joao F. Simoes, Yvonne Louise Thomas, Iris Y. Vasquez, Sean Michael Villasana, Alan R. Woellhart. (Ashley, Katrina) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15735081.) filed by Hilliard Martinez Gonzales LLP. (Ashley, Katrina) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15734984.) filed by Hilliard Martinez Gonzales LLP. (O'Connor, Benjamin) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15734865.) filed by Hilliard Martinez Gonzales LLP. (Pixton, R. Allan) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15734738.) filed by Hilliard Martinez Gonzales LLP. (Hilliard, Robert) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 19, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Howard L. Brown, Nelda J. Moore, David Lawrence Schuller, Shelia Holmes, Alicia C. Dennard, Kevin Crowell, Nicholas R. Schindler, Alan R. Woellhart, Leslie Oyoumick, Yvonne Louise Thomas, Paul Poore, Keith D. Owens, Joann Lynn Blough, Veronica L. Hoover, Sean Michael Villasana, David Christopher Pitts, Timothy Joe Davis, Tracey Kelly, Carrie Estelle Davis, Gregory Lynn Freeze, Iris Y. Vasquez, Joao F. Simoes, Milton Epps, Katherine J. Grafton, Errol Q. Jackson, David R. Hillard, Richard Arnold Davis, Michael J. Sanchez, Hero Corona, David A. Macak. Service waived by Gilead Sciences, Inc. waiver sent on 3/16/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES FORPRETRIAL PURPOSES by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (610) Stipulation in case 4:18-cv-06972-JST; granting (7) Stipulation in case 4:21-cv-01282-JST; granting (7) Stipulation in case 4:21-cv-01499-JST. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2021)
March 18, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR PRETRIAL PURPOSES filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 3/18/2021)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 3/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2021)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RELATING CASES to 18-cv-06972-JST. Motions terminated: (608 in 4:18-cv-06972-JST) Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Adrian Holley. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 17, 2021. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2021)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re #3 : Initial Case Management Conference rescheduled to 6/2/2021 10:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/11/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2021)
March 3, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/26/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2021)
March 3, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/17/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2021)
March 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (with jury demand) (no process) against Gilead Sciences, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15646846). Filed by Howard L. Brown, Nelda J. Moore, David Lawrence Schuller, Shelia Holmes, Alicia C. Dennard, Kevin Crowell, Nicholas R. Schindler, Alan R. Woellhart, Leslie Oyoumick, Yvonne Louise Thomas, Paul Poore, Keith D. Owens, Joann Lynn Blough, Veronica L. Hoover, Sean Michael Villasana, David Christopher Pitts, Timothy Joe Davis, Tracey Kelly, Carrie Estelle Davis, Gregory Lynn Freeze, Iris Y. Vasquez, Joao F. Simoes, Milton Epps, Katherine J. Grafton, Errol Q. Jackson, David R. Hillard, Richard Arnold Davis, Michael J. Sanchez, Hero Corona, David A. Macak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Notice Letter), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 3/3/2021) Modified on 3/3/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woellhart et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica L. Hoover
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia C. Dennard
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Joe Davis
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard L. Brown
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Estelle Davis
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Christopher Pitts
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Crowell
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas R. Schindler
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelda J. Moore
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelia Holmes
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David R. Hillard
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Arnold Davis
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Poore
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Lynn Freeze
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hero Corona
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Kelly
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Lynn Blough
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lawrence Schuller
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joao F. Simoes
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Errol Q. Jackson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine J. Grafton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Oyoumick
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Macak
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iris Y. Vasquez
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan R. Woellhart
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Sanchez
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith D. Owens
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Epps
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Louise Thomas
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Michael Villasana
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilliard Martinez Gonzales LLP
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Eugene Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?