Scott v. Yellen et al
Plaintiff: Donnie Scott
Defendant: Charles Rettig and Janet Yellen
Case Number: 4:2021cv01519
Filed: March 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC AGB
Referring Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REVOKING PLAINTIFF'S IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/28/2021. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 28, 2021 Filing 13 USCA REFERRAL NOTICE: That within (21) twenty-one-days of this notice, the district court is requested to notify the USCA to determine whether in forma pauperis status should continue as to #9 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit. USCA No. 21-15750. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2021)
April 27, 2021 Filing 12 USCA Case Number 21-15750 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for #9 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Donnie Scott. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO ALTER OR AMEND JUDGMENT by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying #10 Motion to Vacate #7 Order Dismissing Case, #8 Judgment. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 19, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Vacate #7 Order Dismissing Case, #8 Judgment, filed by Donnie Scott. Responses due by 5/17/2021. Replies due by 6/1/2021. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2021)
April 19, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Donnie Scott. Appeal of Order Dismissing Case, #7 , Judgment, #8 . (IFP Request was previously granted by the Court on 3/16/2021). ***IFP Status; REVOKED. See Order #14 *** (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2021) Modified on 4/29/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2021 Filing 8 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/16/2021. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/16/2021. ***Civil Case Terminated. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 3, 2021 Filing 5 Declaration of Donnie Scott in Support of #3 Motion and Proposed Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Donnie Scott. (Related document(s) #3 ) (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2021)
March 3, 2021 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 Motion and Proposed Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Donnie Scott. (Related document(s) #3 ) (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2021)
March 3, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION and Proposed Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction With Declaration of Donnie Scott in Support, filed by Donnie Scott. Responses due by 3/31/2021. Replies due by 4/14/2021. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2021)
March 3, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Donnie Scott. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2021)
March 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; No Process with Jury Demand against Charles Rettig, Janet Yellen. Filed by Donnie Scott. (Filing Fee: NOT PAID; IFPP). (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Yellen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Rettig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Yellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnie Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?