Belfield v. Pickett
Plaintiff: Tony Maurice Belfield
Defendant: Warden Jason Pickett
Case Number: 4:2021cv01838
Filed: March 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC CHC
Referring Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2021 In response to Dkt. No. 3 mailed plaintiff copy of docket no.2 and copy of docket sheet. (aea, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2021)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION OR FILING FEE. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/30/2021. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address and Status Update by Tony Maurice Belfield (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2021)
March 16, 2021 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 4/23/2021. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 16, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.00.) Filed by Tony Maurice Belfield. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belfield v. Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Maurice Belfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Jason Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?