Johnson et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Plaintiff: John Whitaker, John J. Conrad, Monica E. Woods, Luiz M. Vasconez, Jotye Monee Robinson, David Geronimo Archuleta, Linda F. Ritchey, Randy A. Yates, Elouise V. Terry, Eric Jason Lloyd, Crystal Dawn Delancy, Flora Armstead, Clarence Johnson, Lowell James Andrew, Edward G. Lantz, Kirk Brown, Gaye L. Marshall, Gary D. Robertson, Robert Charles, Thomas D. Orfe, Scott Lee Busier, Kenneth Kerr, Hilton Lee Williams, Jr., Jamieson John Banks, Mike Graham, Preston L. Kates and Hilliard Martinez Gonzales LLP
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv01931
Filed: March 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Whitney Jo Butcher.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2021)
May 7, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15940920.) filed by Lowell James Andrew, David Geronimo Archuleta, Flora Armstead, Jamieson John Banks, Kirk Brown, Scott Lee Busier, Robert Charles, John J. Conrad, Crystal Dawn Delancy, Mike Graham, Hilliard Martinez Gonzales LLP, Clarence Johnson, Preston L. Kates, Kenneth Kerr, Edward G. Lantz, Eric Jason Lloyd, Gaye L. Marshall, Thomas D. Orfe, Linda F. Ritchey, Gary D. Robertson, Jotye Monee Robinson, Elouise V. Terry, Luiz M. Vasconez, John Whitaker, Hilton Lee Williams, Jr, Monica E. Woods, Randy A. Yates. (Butcher, Whitney) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS AND RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (640) Stipulation in case 4:18-cv-06972-JST; granting (21) Stipulation in case 4:21-cv-01931-JST; granting (9) Stipulation in case 4:21-cv-02039-JST. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2021)
April 5, 2021 Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS AND RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc. and Clarence Johnson. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 4/5/2021) Modified on 4/5/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2021 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jamieson John Banks, Monica E. Woods, Flora Armstead, Thomas D. Orfe, Linda F. Ritchey, Crystal Dawn Delancy, Preston L. Kates, Clarence Johnson, Lowell James Andrew, Randy A. Yates, Kirk Brown, John J. Conrad, Scott Lee Busier, Eric Jason Lloyd, David Geronimo Archuleta, Gaye L. Marshall, John Whitaker, Jotye Monee Robinson, Mike Graham, Kenneth Kerr, Gary D. Robertson, Edward G. Lantz, Robert Charles, Hilton Lee Williams, Jr, Luiz M. Vasconez, Elouise V. Terry. Service waived by Gilead Sciences, Inc. waiver sent on 4/2/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 4/5/2021)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR PRETRIAL PURPOSES by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (633) Stipulation in case 4:18-cv-06972-JST; granting (18) Stipulation in case 4:21-cv-01931-JST; granting (6) Stipulation in case 4:21-cv-02039-JST. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
April 2, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR PRETRIAL PURPOSES filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc. and Clarence Johnson. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 4/2/2021) Modified on 4/5/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2021 Filing 17 Case Reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2021)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 31, 2021. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2021)
March 23, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15734943.) Filing fee previously paid on 3/22/21 filed by Lowell James Andrew, David Geronimo Archuleta, Flora Armstead, Jamieson John Banks, Kirk Brown, Scott Lee Busier, Robert Charles, John J. Conrad, Crystal Dawn Delancy, Mike Graham, Clarence Johnson, Preston L. Kates, Kenneth Kerr, Edward G. Lantz, Eric Jason Lloyd, Gaye L. Marshall, Thomas D. Orfe, Linda F. Ritchey, Gary D. Robertson, Jotye Monee Robinson, Elouise V. Terry, Luiz M. Vasconez, John Whitaker, Hilton Lee Williams, Jr, Monica E. Woods, Randy A. Yates. (O'Connor, Benjamin) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 23, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15734686.) Filing fee previously paid on 3/22/21 filed by Lowell James Andrew, David Geronimo Archuleta, Flora Armstead, Jamieson John Banks, Kirk Brown, Scott Lee Busier, Robert Charles, John J. Conrad, Crystal Dawn Delancy, Mike Graham, Clarence Johnson, Preston L. Kates, Kenneth Kerr, Edward G. Lantz, Eric Jason Lloyd, Gaye L. Marshall, Thomas D. Orfe, Linda F. Ritchey, Gary D. Robertson, Jotye Monee Robinson, Elouise V. Terry, Luiz M. Vasconez, John Whitaker, Hilton Lee Williams, Jr, Monica E. Woods, Randy A. Yates. (Hilliard, Robert) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 23, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15734824.) Filing fee previously paid on 3/22/21 filed by Lowell James Andrew, David Geronimo Archuleta, Flora Armstead, Jamieson John Banks, Kirk Brown, Scott Lee Busier, Robert Charles, John J. Conrad, Crystal Dawn Delancy, Mike Graham, Clarence Johnson, Preston L. Kates, Kenneth Kerr, Edward G. Lantz, Eric Jason Lloyd, Gaye L. Marshall, Thomas D. Orfe, Linda F. Ritchey, Gary D. Robertson, Jotye Monee Robinson, Elouise V. Terry, Luiz M. Vasconez, John Whitaker, Hilton Lee Williams, Jr, Monica E. Woods, Randy A. Yates. (Pixton, R. Allan) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 23, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15735049.) Filing fee previously paid on 3/22/21 filed by Lowell James Andrew, David Geronimo Archuleta, Flora Armstead, Jamieson John Banks, Kirk Brown, Scott Lee Busier, Robert Charles, John J. Conrad, Crystal Dawn Delancy, Mike Graham, Clarence Johnson, Preston L. Kates, Kenneth Kerr, Edward G. Lantz, Eric Jason Lloyd, Gaye L. Marshall, Thomas D. Orfe, Linda F. Ritchey, Gary D. Robertson, Jotye Monee Robinson, Elouise V. Terry, Luiz M. Vasconez, John Whitaker, Hilton Lee Williams, Jr, Monica E. Woods, Randy A. Yates. (Ashley, Katrina) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Katrina R. Ashley representing Plaintiffs. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Benjamin Ryan O'Connor representing Plaintiffs. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney R. Allan Pixton representing Plaintiffs. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Robert C. Hilliard representing Plaintiffs. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15735049.) filed by Hilliard Martinez Gonzales LLP. (Ashley, Katrina) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15734943.) filed by Hilliard Martinez Gonzales LLP. (O'Connor, Benjamin) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15734824.) filed by Hilliard Martinez Gonzales LLP. (Pixton, R. Allan) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15734686.) filed by Hilliard Martinez Gonzales LLP. (Hilliard, Robert) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 19, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/10/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/17/2021 11:00 AM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
March 19, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/2/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
March 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gilead Sciences, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15724334.). Filed byJamieson John Banks, Monica E. Woods, Flora Armstead, Thomas D. Orfe, Linda F. Ritchey, Crystal Dawn Delancy, Preston L. Kates, Clarence Johnson, Lowell James Andrew, Randy A. Yates, Kirk Brown, John J. Conrad, Scott Lee Busier, Eric Jason Lloyd, David Geronimo Archuleta, Gaye L. Marshall, John Whitaker, Jotye Monee Robinson, Mike Graham, Kenneth Kerr, Gary D. Robertson, Edward G. Lantz, Robert Charles, Hilton Lee Williams, Jr, Luiz M. Vasconez, Elouise V. Terry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Notice Letter), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 3/19/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Whitaker
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Whitney Jo Butcher
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Conrad
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Whitney Jo Butcher
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica E. Woods
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Whitney Jo Butcher
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luiz M. Vasconez
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Whitney Jo Butcher
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jotye Monee Robinson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Whitney Jo Butcher
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Geronimo Archuleta
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Whitney Jo Butcher
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda F. Ritchey
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Whitney Jo Butcher
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy A. Yates
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Whitney Jo Butcher
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elouise V. Terry
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Whitney Jo Butcher
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Jason Lloyd
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Whitney Jo Butcher
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Dawn Delancy
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Whitney Jo Butcher
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flora Armstead
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Whitney Jo Butcher
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Whitney Jo Butcher
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lowell James Andrew
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Whitney Jo Butcher
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward G. Lantz
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Whitney Jo Butcher
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Brown
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Whitney Jo Butcher
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gaye L. Marshall
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Whitney Jo Butcher
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary D. Robertson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Whitney Jo Butcher
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Charles
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Whitney Jo Butcher
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas D. Orfe
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Whitney Jo Butcher
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Lee Busier
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Whitney Jo Butcher
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Kerr
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Whitney Jo Butcher
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilton Lee Williams, Jr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Whitney Jo Butcher
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamieson John Banks
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Whitney Jo Butcher
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Graham
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Whitney Jo Butcher
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Preston L. Kates
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Whitney Jo Butcher
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilliard Martinez Gonzales LLP
Represented By: Whitney Jo Butcher
Represented By: Benjamin Ryan O'Connor
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Eugene Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?