CSAA Insurance Exchange v. Carrier Corporation et al
Plaintiff: CSAA Insurance Exchange
Defendant: Carrier Corporation, Broan NuTone LLC and Venmar Ventilation ULC
Case Number: 4:2021cv01957
Filed: March 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE to Plaintiff of Service of Notice of Case Assignment; United States District Court Standing Orders for the Northern District; and Consent or Declination to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction by Venmar Ventilation ULC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scordalakis, Steven) (Filed on 3/31/2021) Modified on 3/31/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/31/2021 (ecgS, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 6/21/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for Monday, 6/28/2021 02:00 PM Via Zoom Webinar Videoconference. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) Zoom link information will be posted on the docket in advance of the hearing. Zoom link information is also on the Judge's page on the court website www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/gonzalez-rogers-yvonne-ygr/ (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2021)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 03/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
March 23, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 23, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Venmar Ventilation ULC.. (Scordalakis, Steven) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/14/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/5/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 19, 2021 Answer to Removed Complaint (See Doc No. #1 -2) byCarrier Corporation, Venmar Ventilation ULC. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
March 19, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED Civil Cover Sheet by Carrier Corporation, Venmar Ventilation ULC. (Mijanovic, Krsto) (Filed on 3/19/2021) Modified on 3/22/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2021 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Carrier Corporation, Venmar Ventilation ULC. (Mijanovic, Krsto) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
March 19, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Carrier Corporation, Venmar Ventilation ULC (Mijanovic, Krsto) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
March 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Civil Action from Contra Costa County Superior Court. Their case number is C21-00293. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number 0971-15727774). Filed by Venmar Ventilation ULC, Carrier Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Declaration of Krsto Mijanovic, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Mijanovic, Krsto) (Filed on 3/19/2021) Modified on 3/22/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CSAA Insurance Exchange v. Carrier Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Krsto Mijanovic
Represented By: Steven A. Scordalakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broan NuTone LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venmar Ventilation ULC
Represented By: Krsto Mijanovic
Represented By: Steven A. Scordalakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CSAA Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Robert Edgar Wall, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?