US Cotton, LLC v. A to Z Beauty, LLC
Plaintiff: US Cotton, LLC
Defendant: A to Z Beauty, LLC and A to Z Beauty, LLC doing business as Cliganic
Case Number: 4:2021cv02141
Filed: March 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by US Cotton, LLC. Service waived by A to Z Beauty, LLC waiver sent on 4/29/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (Rodenbaugh, Michael) (Filed on 5/3/2021)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan M. Hines. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2021)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Matthew Jacob Ladenheim. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2021)
April 14, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan M. Hines (Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15834708.) filed by US Cotton, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit cert. good stand)(Hines, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/14/2021) Modified on 4/15/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Matthew Jacob Ladenheim. ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15832686.) filed by US Cotton, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. Good. Standing)(Ladenheim, Matthew) (Filed on 4/13/2021) Modified on 4/14/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for July 6, 2021, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by June 29th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:21-cv-02141-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 4/12/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
April 9, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 9, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by US Cotton, LLC.. (Rodenbaugh, Michael) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
March 31, 2021 Filing 8 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Rodenbaugh, Michael) (Filed on 3/31/2021)
March 31, 2021 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/23/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/30/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2021)
March 31, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to A to Z Beauty, LLC. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2021)
March 31, 2021 #Electronic filing error. AO-CAND-120 Form is missing. Submit your document using Other Documents> Patent/Trademark Report> Re: #1 Complaint filed by US Cotton, LLC. (cjl S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2021)
March 26, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/9/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2021)
March 26, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Rodenbaugh, Michael) (Filed on 3/26/2021)
March 26, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by US Cotton, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Parkdale Incorporated for US Cotton, LLC. (Rodenbaugh, Michael) (Filed on 3/26/2021)
March 26, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by US Cotton, LLC . (Rodenbaugh, Michael) (Filed on 3/26/2021)
March 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15758358.). Filed byUS Cotton, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Rodenbaugh, Michael) (Filed on 3/26/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Cotton, LLC v. A to Z Beauty, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Cotton, LLC
Represented By: Michael Lawrence Rodenbaugh
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Hines
Represented By: Matthew Jacob Ladenheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A to Z Beauty, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A to Z Beauty, LLC doing business as Cliganic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?