Center for Biological Diversity, Inc. et al v. Regan
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity, Inc. and Center for Environmental Health
Defendant: Michael S. Regan
Case Number: 4:2021cv02498
Filed: April 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 7604
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2021 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Michael S. Regan. Filed byCenter for Biological Diversity, Inc.. (Bruner, Ashley) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 24, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie M. Hill (Hill, Leslie) (Filed on 5/24/2021)
April 27, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Center for Biological Diversity, Inc.. Michael S. Regan served on 4/19/2021, answer due 6/18/2021. (Bruner, Ashley) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
April 12, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 7/6/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/13/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 4/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
April 9, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 9, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Center for Biological Diversity, Inc... (Bruner, Ashley) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #4 Ashley Bruner's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
April 8, 2021 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/30/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/7/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
April 8, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Michael S. Regan. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
April 7, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/21/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2021)
April 7, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Ashley Bruner (Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15807456) filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Inc., Center for Environmental Health. (Bruner, Ashley) (Filed on 4/7/2021) Modified on 4/8/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Parties by Center for Biological Diversity, Inc., Center for Environmental Health. (Evans, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/7/2021) Modified on 4/8/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Evans, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/7/2021)
April 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Michael S. Regan ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15805300.). Filed byCenter for Biological Diversity, Inc., Center for Environmental Health. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Evans, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/7/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity, Inc. et al v. Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Carter Evans
Represented By: Ashley Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Environmental Health
Represented By: Jonathan Carter Evans
Represented By: Ashley Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael S. Regan
Represented By: Leslie M. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?