Enea et al v. Minichiello et al
Plaintiff: Sharon Enea and Richard Enea
Defendant: Courtney Gulick, Dreamspace Dance & Performing Arts, LLC and Ausjoli Minichiello
Case Number: 4:2021cv02635
Filed: April 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by Richard Enea, Sharon Enea (Quashnock, Marie) (Filed on 4/22/2021)
April 19, 2021 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/14/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/21/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2021)
April 19, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Please complete and file the REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION ON APPEAL REGARDING A COPYRIGHT, AO 121 (Rev. 06/16)(CAND version 8/18) f orm. Re: #1 Erroneous Motion,,, Complaint,, filed by Sharon Enea, Richard Enea (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2021)
April 15, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Dreamspace Dance & Performing Arts, LLC, Courtney Gulick, Ausjoli Minichiello. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 15, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Richard Enea, Sharon Enea.. (Quashnock, Marie) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 15, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Quashnock, Marie) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 14, 2021 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. The summons is incomplete. Please re-file in its entirety once all the information required on the summons is completed. Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by Sharon Enea, Richard Enea (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2021)
April 14, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]The correct event is Complaint. The correct event can be found at: Civil Events > Initial Pleadings and Service > Com plaints and Other Initiating Documents > Complaint. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer,,, Complaint,, filed by Sharon Enea, Richard Enea (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2021)
April 13, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/27/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2021)
April 13, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Quashnock, Marie) (Filed on 4/13/2021)
April 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Breach of Written Contract, Breach of Oral Contract, Misappropriation of Trade Secrets, Copyright Infringement, and Violation of California Comprehensive Computer Data Access and Fraud Act against Courtney Gulick, Ausjoli Minichiello, Dreamspace Dance & Performing Arts, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15830167.). Filed by Sharon Enea, Richard Enea. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Quashnock, Marie) (Filed on 4/13/2021) Modified on 4/14/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enea et al v. Minichiello et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Gulick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dreamspace Dance & Performing Arts, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ausjoli Minichiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Enea
Represented By: Marie Gisele Quashnock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Enea
Represented By: Marie Gisele Quashnock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?