Brackett v. American Airlines Group Inc.
Plaintiff: Bivett Brackett
Defendant: American Airlines Group Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv02681
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. RESETTING the briefing schedule for Dkt. No. #10 Defendant's motion to dismiss. Plaintiff's opposition is due by June 30, 2021, and Defendant's reply is due by July 14, 2021. This text order terminates Dkt. No. #15 Plaintiff's administrative motion. Going forward, the Court expects Plaintiff's counsel to scrupulously meet all deadlines imposed by the local rules, and will not accept further excuses blaming the other side for counsel's own mistakes. For example, the local rules base the opposition due date on the date the motion was filed, not the hearing date. See Civil L-R 7-3(a). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2021) Modified on 5/12/2021 to terminate administrative motion(hsglc2S, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2021 Filing 15 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to continue briefing schedule re Electronic Filing Error, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, 12 Clerk's Notice,, #14 Reply to Opposition/Response, #10 MOTION to Dismiss , #13 Notice (Other), filed by Bivett Brackett. Responses due by 5/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Varlack, Tiega) (Filed on 5/11/2021)
May 11, 2021 Filing 14 REPLY (re #10 MOTION to Dismiss ) and Notice of Plaintiff's Non-Opposition filed byAmerican Airlines Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kearns, Patrick) (Filed on 5/11/2021)
April 26, 2021 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Incorrect Event Used. The correct event is Re-notice Motion. Correct event is found under Civil Events > Motions and Relate d Filings > Other Supporting Documents. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #13 Notice (Other) filed by American Airlines Group Inc. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2021)
April 23, 2021 Reset Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss , See Docket No. #13 : Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2021 02:00 PM before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
April 23, 2021 Filing 13 DEFENDANT AMERICAN AIRLINES GROUP, INC., DBA AMERICAN AIRLINES NOTICE AND MOTION TO DISMISS AND TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. RULE 12 by American Airlines Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kearns, Patrick) (Filed on 4/23/2021) Modified on 4/26/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that counsel must re-notice not re- file the #10 motion to dismiss. Hearing date of June 3rd, is vacated. The briefing schedule remains in effect. Counsel is directed to check the Court's scheduling notes before re-noticing the motion for a new hearing date. June 3rd was not the Court's next available hearing date when this motion was e-filed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
April 23, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Airlines Group Inc. (Kearns, Patrick) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
April 23, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by American Airlines Group Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 5/7/2021. Replies due by 5/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Kearns, Patrick) (Filed on 4/23/2021) Modified on 4/26/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for July 27, 2021, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by July 20, 2021. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:21-cv-02681-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Signed by Clerk on 4/22/2021. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2021)
April 21, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
April 21, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Airlines Group Inc... (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kearns, Patrick) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
April 21, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by American Airlines Group Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/27/2021 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 5/5/2021. Replies due by 5/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kearns, Patrick) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
April 15, 2021 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by American Airlines Group Inc. identifying Other Affiliate American International Group (AIG) for American Airlines Group Inc.. (Kearns, Patrick) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 15, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/14/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/21/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 15, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures. The cor rect event can be found at: Civil Events > Other Filings > Notices > Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures. Please re-file in its entirety. Re:[1-2] Notice of Parties with Financial Interests, filed by American Airlines Group Inc. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/28/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2021)
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco County Superior Court with jury demand. Their case number is CGC-21-588897. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-15837108). Filed by American Airlines Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Parties with Financial Interests, #3 Jury Demand)(Kearns, Patrick) (Filed on 4/14/2021) Modified on 4/15/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brackett v. American Airlines Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bivett Brackett
Represented By: Tiega Noel Varlack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines Group Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Kearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?