American Small Business League v. United States Small Business Administration
Plaintiff: American Small Business League
Defendant: United States Small Business Administration
Case Number: 4:2021cv02877
Filed: April 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2021 Filing 8 Refund Status re #7 Application for Refund Approved. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2021)
June 4, 2021 Filing 7 Application for Refund re #3 Complaint, Receipt Number 0971-15901585 by American Small Business League. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 6/4/2021)
May 11, 2021 Filing 6 DEFENDANT UNITED STATES SMALL BUSINESS ADMIMISTRATON'S ANSWER to Complaint byUnited States Small Business Administration. (Brakebill, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/11/2021)
April 29, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to United States Small Business Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2021)
April 28, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Olson, Karl) (Filed on 4/28/2021)
April 28, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against United States Small Business Administration ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15901734.). Filed byAmerican Small Business League. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Olson, Karl) (Filed on 4/28/2021)
April 21, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/14/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/21/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER Granting Motion to Sever. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on April 21, 2021. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Small Business League v. United States Small Business Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Small Business Administration
Represented By: Kenneth Warren Brakebill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Small Business League
Represented By: Karl Olson
Represented By: Irene Lee
Represented By: Aaron Robert Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?