Candilario v. American Lung Association et al
Plaintiff: Judith L Candilario
Defendant: Met Life Annuity & Retirement Services and American Lung Association
Case Number: 4:2021cv03053
Filed: April 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Filing 6 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 6/10/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2021)
May 12, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/26/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2021)
April 28, 2021 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Baron J. Drexel. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document (dkt. #: 1 Complaint filed by Judi th L Candilario). Please update your personal profile on ECF. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2021)
April 28, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/28/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/4/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2021)
April 27, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/11/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
April 27, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet ( Filing fee $ 49, receipt number 0971-15892364.). Filed by Judith L Candilario. (Drexel, Baron) (Filed on 4/27/2021) Clerk made correction to document caption.
April 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with jury demand (no process)( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15892291.). Filed by Judith L Candilario. (Drexel, Baron) (Filed on 4/27/2021) Modified on 4/28/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Candilario v. American Lung Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Met Life Annuity & Retirement Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Lung Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith L Candilario
Represented By: Baron J. Drexel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?