Bush v. Sonoma West Holdings Inc et al
Plaintiff: William David Bush
Defendant: Sonoma West Holdings Inc and Stapleton Acquisition Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv03069
Filed: April 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1319
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Response due by July 13, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/22/2021. (dmrlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2021)
May 7, 2021 Filing 5 Photographic EXHIBITS filed by William David Bush. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
May 7, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by William David Bush. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
April 27, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/28/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/4/2021 at 1:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 27, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William David Bush. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
April 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by William David Bush. Consent/Declination due by 5/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1, #2 Exhibits 2, #3 Exhibits 3, #4 Exhibits 4, #5 Exhibits 5, #6 Exhibits 6, #7 Exhibits 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Envelope) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bush v. Sonoma West Holdings Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William David Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonoma West Holdings Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stapleton Acquisition Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?