Physicians Committee for Responsible Medicine et al v. Vilsack et al
Plaintiff: Donald Forrester, Seth Ammerman, Heather Shenkman and Physicians Committee for Responsible Medicine
Defendant: Xavier Becerra and Tom Vilsack
Case Number: 4:2021cv03088
Filed: April 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Referring Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE: Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/28/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/4/2021 02:45 PM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 5/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2021)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case,. Signed by The Clerk on 4/30/21. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 30, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 29, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Seth Ammerman, Donald Forrester, Physicians Committee for Responsible Medicine, Heather Shenkman.. (Page, Corey) (Filed on 4/29/2021)
April 29, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Xavier Becerra, Tom Vilsack, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2021)
April 29, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/22/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/29/2021 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2021)
April 28, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/12/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2021)
April 28, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Page, Corey) (Filed on 4/28/2021)
April 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Xavier Becerra, Tom Vilsack ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15896675.). Filed byHeather Shenkman, Physicians Committee for Responsible Medicine, Donald Forrester, Seth Ammerman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Page, Corey) (Filed on 4/28/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Physicians Committee for Responsible Medicine et al v. Vilsack et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Vilsack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Forrester
Represented By: Corey Page
Represented By: Geneva Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth Ammerman
Represented By: Corey Page
Represented By: Geneva Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Shenkman
Represented By: Corey Page
Represented By: Geneva Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Physicians Committee for Responsible Medicine
Represented By: Corey Page
Represented By: Geneva Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?