World Champ Tech LLC v. Peloton Interactive, Inc.
Plaintiff: World Champ Tech LLC
Defendant: Peloton Interactive, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv03202
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against World Champ Tech LLC byPeloton Interactive, Inc.. (Conrad, Mark) (Filed on 6/15/2021)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULINGORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVILCASE:Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/29/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2021 02:30 PM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 6/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2021)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 06/07/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2021)
June 4, 2021 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2021)
June 4, 2021 Filing 18 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Peloton Interactive, Inc... (Conrad, Mark) (Filed on 6/4/2021)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2021)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2021)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2021)
May 25, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of David Donahue ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16007912.) filed by Peloton Interactive, Inc.. (Donahue, David) (Filed on 5/25/2021)
May 25, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Nicole Lieberman ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16007895.) filed by Peloton Interactive, Inc.. (Lieberman, Nicole) (Filed on 5/25/2021)
May 25, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Leo Kittay ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16007794.) filed by Peloton Interactive, Inc.. (Kittay, Leo) (Filed on 5/25/2021)
May 25, 2021 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 6/8/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2021)
May 25, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Peloton Interactive, Inc. to Respond to Complaint filed by Peloton Interactive, Inc.. (Conrad, Mark) (Filed on 5/25/2021)
May 5, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by World Champ Tech LLC.. (Hall, Laurie) (Filed on 5/5/2021)
May 5, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by World Champ Tech LLC (Hall, Laurie) (Filed on 5/5/2021)
May 3, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS filed by World Champ Tech LLC (Hall, Laurie) (Filed on 5/3/2021)
May 3, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Peloton Interactive, Inc.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2021)
May 3, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/26/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/2/2021 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2021)
April 30, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/14/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 30, 2021 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (Hall, Laurie) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 30, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Hall, Laurie) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Peloton Interactive, Inc., (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number 0971-15909835). Filed by World Champ Tech LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hall, Laurie) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 5/3/2021 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: World Champ Tech LLC v. Peloton Interactive, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peloton Interactive, Inc.
Represented By: David Donahue
Represented By: Nicole Mary Lieberman
Represented By: Mark R. Conrad
Represented By: Leo Benjamin Kittay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: World Champ Tech LLC
Represented By: Laurie Elizabeth Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?