Milling et al v. Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Suzanna Milling and John Milling
Defendant: Chevron USA, Inc., Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC and Syngenta AG
Case Number: 4:2021cv03233
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Receipt Acknowledging Transmission of Electronic Case File Documents, from U.S. District Court, Southern District of Illinois. Their Case No. 3:21-pq-00671 (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2021)
June 17, 2021 Filing 10 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) MDL 3004: Transferring case to the U.S.District Court, Southern District of Illinois at East St. Louis. Signed by The Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, on 06/17/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2021)
June 17, 2021 Case electronically transferred to the U.S. District Court, Eastern District of Illinois, East St. Louis. Counsel notified (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2021)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/26/21. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/13/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2021 11:00 AM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only.This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 1-888-684-8852Access Code: 8583698#The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 05/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 25, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2021)
May 24, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by John Milling, Suzanna Milling.. (Kaufman, Peter) (Filed on 5/24/2021)
May 19, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 6/2/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2021)
May 3, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/26/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/2/2021 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2021)
May 3, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE: Please note that case was initiated using Nature of Suit 245 (Tort Product Liability) however, Nature of Suit Selection on Civil Sheet is 365 (Personal Injury-Product Liability. If correct Nature of Suit is 245 (Tort Product Liability) please file Amended Civil Cover Sheet indicating that selection as correct Nature of Suit. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2021)
May 3, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Case has been randomly assigned to judge, however incorrect Civil Cover Sheet CAND 44 (Rev. 07/16) used at case opening. Please complete and re-file as a separate docket entry correct Civil Cover Sheet JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 10/20 re: #1 , #1 Complaint filed by Suzanna Milling, John Milling (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2021)
April 30, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/14/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY TRIAL DEMANDED against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number 0971-15913978). Filed by John Milling, Suzanna Milling. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaufman, Peter) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 5/3/2021 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milling et al v. Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanna Milling
Represented By: Peter Lawrence Kaufman
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Mark A DiCello
Represented By: Mark Abramowitz
Represented By: Katherine A. Kiziah
Represented By: C. Calvin Warriner III
Represented By: Amy E. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Milling
Represented By: Peter Lawrence Kaufman
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Mark A DiCello
Represented By: Mark Abramowitz
Represented By: Katherine A. Kiziah
Represented By: C. Calvin Warriner III
Represented By: Amy E. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?