Langer v. Maxsold Inc.
Plaintiff: Chris Langer
Defendant: Maxsold Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv03329
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore Granting #12 JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2021)
June 11, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Deadline to Respond to First Amended Complaint filed by Maxsold Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bogue, Maureen) (Filed on 6/11/2021)
June 11, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Maureen K. Bogue (Bogue, Maureen) (Filed on 6/11/2021)
June 3, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT For Damages And Injunctive Relief For Violations Of: Americans With Disabilities Act; Unruh Civil Rights Act against Maxsold Inc.. Filed byChris Langer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Zaman, Tehniat) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Tehniat Zaman (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Zaman, Tehniat) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
May 18, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chris Langer. Maxsold Inc. served on 5/14/2021, answer due 6/4/2021. (Handy, Russell) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
May 7, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Chris Langer.. (Handy, Russell) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
May 6, 2021 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2021)
May 6, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Maxsold Inc.. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2021)
May 6, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Missing case number. Please ensure that all future documents filed have the case number 4:21-cv-03329-KAW. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Complaint filed by Chris Langer, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Chris Langer (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2021) Modified on 5/6/2021 (anjS, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/19/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2021)
May 5, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Handy, Russell) (Filed on 5/5/2021)
May 5, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Chris Langer re #1 Complaint (Handy, Russell) (Filed on 5/5/2021)
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15927368.). Filed byChris Langer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Handy, Russell) (Filed on 5/5/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langer v. Maxsold Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Langer
Represented By: Russell Clive Handy
Represented By: Zachary Best
Represented By: Tehniat Zaman
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxsold Inc.
Represented By: Maureen K. Bogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?