In re Michael David Grant
Petitioner: Michael David Grant
Respondent: California Department of Corrections, and Rehabilitation (CDCR)
Case Number: 4:2021cv03730
Filed: May 18, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC AGB
Referring Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2021 Filing 6 Request for Judicial Notice re #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed byMichael David Grant. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Related document(s) #4 ) (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2021)
June 14, 2021 Filing 5 Supplemental PETITION for Immediate Emergency Order Granting Injunctive Relief Order Against State Prison Officials (Filing Fee: NOT PAID, IFPP). Filed by Michael David Grant. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2021) Modified on 6/15/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael David Grant. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2021)
May 18, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 6/25/2021. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 18, 2021 Filing 2 Letter re Request for Ruling on Petition, from Michael David Grant, dated 05/04/21. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
May 18, 2021 Filing 1 Emergency PETITION for Immediate Order Granting Injunction Against State Prison Official's (California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR) from Withholding Inmates Federal CARES Act Stimulus Funds, filed by Michael David Grant. No Process. (Filing Fee: NOT PAID). Responses due by 6/15/2021. Replies due by 6/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Michael David Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael David Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: California Department of Corrections, and Rehabilitation (CDCR)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?