Bluestar Genomics v. Song et al
Plaintiff: BlueStar Genomics
Defendant: Ludwig Institute For Cancer Research Ltd. and Chunxiao Song
Case Number: 4:2021cv04507
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Joe G. Chen.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Paul W. Kalish.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Cali Spota.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jonathan R. Lagarenne.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Gerard P. Norton.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 6, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Joe G. Chen ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16259146.) filed by Ludwig Institute For Cancer Research Ltd.. (Chen, Joe) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 6, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Paul W. Kalish ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16259106.) filed by Ludwig Institute For Cancer Research Ltd.. (Kalish, Paul) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 6, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Cali Spota ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16259080.) filed by Ludwig Institute For Cancer Research Ltd.. (Spota, Cali) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 6, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan R. Lagarenne ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16259060.) filed by Ludwig Institute For Cancer Research Ltd.. (Lagarenne, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 6, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Gerard P. Norton ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16258953.) filed by Ludwig Institute For Cancer Research Ltd.. (Norton, Gerard) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to E. Page Wilkins.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2021)
August 5, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16255030.) filed by Chunxiao Song. (Wilkins, Elizabeth) (Filed on 8/5/2021)
July 23, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATION To Extend Time To Respond to Initial Complaint filed by Bluestar Genomics and Chunxiao Song. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 7/23/2021) Modified on 7/26/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bluestar Genomics. Chunxiao Song served on 7/5/2021, answer due 7/26/2021.1 (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 7/20/2021)
July 19, 2021 #Electronic filing error. No title Page. Certificates/Proofs of Service e-filed separately and not as an attachment, require a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requirement.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #16 Summons Returned Executed filed by Bluestar Genomics (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2021)
July 19, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bluestar Genomics. Chunxiao Song served on 7/5/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 7/19/2021)
July 13, 2021 Filing 15 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,, to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by Ludwig Institute For Cancer Research Ltd.. (Donovan, Dwight) (Filed on 7/13/2021)
July 13, 2021 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Counsel is instructed that all future filings shall bear the initials JST immediately after the case number. Re: #15 Stipulation filed by Ludwig Institute For Cancer Research Ltd. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2021)
June 28, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bluestar Genomics. Ludwig Institute For Cancer Research Ltd. served on 6/23/2021, answer due 7/14/2021. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 6/28/2021)
June 24, 2021 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/21/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/28/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advan ced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than September 27, 2021 by 2:00 p.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.g ov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 9/21/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/28/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2021)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 06/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2021)
June 23, 2021 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2021)
June 23, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bluestar Genomics.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 6/23/2021)
June 14, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Ludwig Institute For Cancer Research Ltd., Chunxiao Song. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2021)
June 14, 2021 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2021)
June 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlin Elizabeth Paulson (Paulson, Kaitlin) (Filed on 6/11/2021)
June 11, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek C. Walter (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 6/11/2021)
June 11, 2021 Filing 5 Rule 7.1 Disclosures of Non-Party Interested Entities Or Persons Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 7.1(a) & Civil Local Rule 3-16 by Bluestar Genomics (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 6/11/2021) Modified on 6/14/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
June 11, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/25/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2021)
June 11, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Robert Reines (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 6/11/2021)
June 11, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 6/11/2021)
June 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract; Demand for Jury Trial against Chunxiao Song, Ludwig Institute for Cancer Research Ltd. (Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number 0971-16066869.). Filed by BlueStar Genomics. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Civil Cover Sheet) (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 6/11/2021) Modified on 6/14/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bluestar Genomics v. Song et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ludwig Institute For Cancer Research Ltd.
Represented By: Cali Spota
Represented By: Dwight Craig Donovan
Represented By: Gerard Patrick Norton
Represented By: Joe Chen
Represented By: Jonathan Lagarenne
Represented By: Paul Kalish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chunxiao Song
Represented By: Elizabeth Page Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BlueStar Genomics
Represented By: Edward Robert Reines
Represented By: Derek C. Walter
Represented By: Kaitlin Elizabeth Paulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?