Davis v. Internal Revenue Service
Plaintiff: Willie Davis
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 4:2021cv04522
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC AGB
Referring Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2021 Filing 10 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/6/2021. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/6/2021. ***Civil Case Terminated. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #2 Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 15, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S LETTER to Plaintiff That Case Has Been Transferred to the Northern District of California (Oakland). (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 14, 2021 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:21-cv-01829. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to Northern District of California. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
June 8, 2021 Interdistrict transfer to Northern District of California. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 6/8/2021, filed. (ShoshanaArnow, 4)
June 7, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (dnoriega, 1)
June 1, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Willie Davis, filed. (dnoriega, 1)
June 1, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Willie Davis, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/22/2021. (dnoriega, 1)
June 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Internal Revenue Service (Filing fee: NOT PAID) filed by Willie Davis.(dnoriega, 1) Modified on 6/14/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?