Walker v. Sanders, et al
Plaintiff: Justin Walker
Defendant: Alameda County Sheriff, Sandy Owyang, Tamara Hearn, Officer J. Sanders, Kwok Yu and Officer McNaughton
Case Number: 4:2021cv04666
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Referring Judge: Alex G Tse
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2021 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION.Counsel for Defendant refiled (instead of re-noticed) the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint at Dkt. No. 13. The original briefing dates in Dkt. no 8 as to the 8/12/21 response and 8/19/21 reply REMAIN IN PLACE. The Motion will be held on 9/14/2021 at 2:00pm via Zoom platform. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #13 AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT : Responses due by 8/12/2021. Replies due by 8/19/2021. Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 2, 2021 Filing 13 AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT filed by Alameda County Sheriff, J. Sanders. Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 8/16/2021. Replies due by 8/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(MacKay, Raymond) (Filed on 8/2/2021) Modified on 8/2/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Alameda County Sheriff, Tamara Hearn, McNaughton, Sandy Owyang, J. Sanders, Kwok Yu. (Attachments: #1 USM Forms)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2021)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 7/30/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 30, 2021 Service packet delivered to the U.S. Marshals Post Box in the Clerks Office mailroom. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2021)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 29, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Alameda County Sheriff, J. Sanders.. (MacKay, Raymond) (Filed on 7/29/2021)
July 29, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; and Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Alameda County Sheriff, J. Sanders. Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Responses due by 8/12/2021. Replies due by 8/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(MacKay, Raymond) (Filed on 7/29/2021)
July 29, 2021 Filing 7 **PLEASE DISREGARD ENTRY**ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 7/29/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 7/29/2021 (haS, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2021 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2021)
July 28, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. The Clerk will now reassign this case to a U.S. District Judge because one or more of the parties has requested reassignment. All hearing dates currently scheduled before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse are vacated. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Justin Walker (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2021)
July 28, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Justin Walker.. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2021)
June 17, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Justin Walker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2021)
June 17, 2021 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/10/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/17/2021 02:00 PM. (Attachments: #1 AGT - Standing Order, #2 Standing Order for All Judges)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alameda County Sheriff, Tamara Hearn, McNaughton, Sandy Owyang, J. Sanders, Kwok Yu. Filed by Justin Walker. (Filing Fee: NOT PAID; IFPP). Consent/Declination due by 7/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Sanders, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alameda County Sheriff
Represented By: Raymond L. MacKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Owyang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamara Hearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer J. Sanders
Represented By: Raymond L. MacKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kwok Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer McNaughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?