Ricksecker v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: GREGORY P. RICKSECKER
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Case Number: 4:2021cv04681
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S #54 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION FOR #41 MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2023)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #54 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Objections due by 2/17/2023. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2023)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Report and Recommendations by Judge Sallie Kim as to #41 Motion for Attorney Fees. (sklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2023) Modified on 2/6/2023 (mkl, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendation RE DOCKET NO. #41 . Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/24/2023. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2023)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim for Report and Recommendation (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2023)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ERRATA re #44 Declaration in Support by Gregory P. Ricksecker. (Linnell, Breita) (Filed on 11/8/2022)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ERRATA re #50 Reply to Opposition/Response by Gregory P. Ricksecker. (Linnell, Breita) (Filed on 11/8/2022)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 REPLY (re #41 MOTION for Attorney Fees Costs and Expenses ) filed byGregory P. Ricksecker. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Breita Linnell)(Linnell, Breita) (Filed on 10/14/2022)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Costs Taxed in amount of $395.90 against Ford Motor Company re #45 Bill of Costs. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2022)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #41 MOTION for Attorney Fees Costs and Expenses ) filed byFord Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Statement Of Non-Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion For Costs And Expenses, #2 Declaration Of Patricia H. Jun In Support Of Defendant Ford Motor Companys Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion For Attorneys Fees, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Patricia H. Jun)(Jun, Patricia) (Filed on 10/7/2022)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE DOCKET NOS. #41 AND #45 . In the future when filing a motion or a bill of cost, please be sure that the supporting documents (declarations, exhibits, and proposed order) are e-filed as attachments to the motion or bill of cost filing and not e-filed as separate filings on the docket. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2022)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Declaration of Zavig Mkrdech in Support of Application for the Bill of Costs filed byGregory P. Ricksecker. (Mkrdech, Zavig) (Filed on 9/23/2022)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 BILL OF COSTS by Gregory P. Ricksecker. Objections due by 10/7/2022. (Mkrdech, Zavig) (Filed on 9/23/2022)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Declaration of Payam Shahian in Support of #41 MOTION for Attorney Fees Costs and Expenses filed byGregory P. Ricksecker. (Related document(s) #41 ) (Mkrdech, Zavig) (Filed on 9/23/2022)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Declaration of Zavig Mkrdech in Support of #41 MOTION for Attorney Fees Costs and Expenses filed byGregory P. Ricksecker. (Related document(s) #41 ) (Mkrdech, Zavig) (Filed on 9/23/2022)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Request for Judicial Notice re #41 MOTION for Attorney Fees Costs and Expenses filed byGregory P. Ricksecker. (Related document(s) #41 ) (Mkrdech, Zavig) (Filed on 9/23/2022)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION for Attorney Fees Costs and Expenses filed by Gregory P. Ricksecker. Motion Hearing set for 2/2/2023 02:00 PM before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 10/7/2022. Replies due by 10/14/2022. (Mkrdech, Zavig) (Filed on 9/23/2022)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Breita Linnell (Linnell, Breita) (Filed on 9/23/2022)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Zavig Mkrdech (Mkrdech, Zavig) (Filed on 9/23/2022)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 JUDGMENT RE DOCKET NO. #36 . ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 9/9/2022. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2022)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CLERK'S NOTICE RE DOCKET NO. #36 . The Judge's name is Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. In the future, the signature line of all proposed orders submitted should include Jr. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2022)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION Regarding Entry of Judgment filed by Gregory P. Ricksecker and Ford Motor Company. (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 9/8/2022) Modified on 9/9/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: Telephonic Further Case Management Conference held on 8/30/2022. Total Time in Court: 3 Minutes. Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Ariel Harman-Holmes. The Court gives the parties 30-days (September 29, 2022) to resolve the fee issue. The Court orders that the parties meet and confer and e-file within one week from today (September 6, 2022) a stipulated proposed judgment. Matter is continued to October 4, 2022 at 2 p.m. for a telephonic further case management conference.The October 4th proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/30/2022)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE RE DOCKET NO. #33 . Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for August 30, 2022, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. No Case Management Statement is due. The August 30th proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2022)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Jun, Patricia) (Filed on 8/22/2022)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Disassociation of Counsel for Plaintiff by Gregory P. Ricksecker (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 6/22/2022) Modified on 6/23/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Nadine Alsaadi (Alsaadi, Nadine) (Filed on 6/2/2022)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Ariel S. Harman-Holmes (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) (Filed on 4/26/2022)
January 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Change of Address by Tionna Grace Dolin (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 1/29/2022)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS by Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr granting #27 Stipulation selecting Private ADR. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2022)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Private ADR. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2022)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Ford Motor Company filed by Ford Motor Company and Gregory P. Ricksecker. (Jun, Patricia) (Filed on 1/18/2022) Modified on 1/19/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/13/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 2/16/2022; Close of Fact Discovery due by 7/25/2022; Opening Reports due by 8/8/2022; Rebuttal Reports due by 8/22/2022; Close of Expert Discovery due by 9/5/2022; Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Pretrial Conference set for 1/3/2023 03:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; and Jury Selection / Jury Trial (4-day) set for 1/23/2023 08:30 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2022)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference held on 1/11/2022.Total Time in Court: 6 minutes. Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Karin Kuemerle. Defendant Attorney: Patricia Jun. Parties are directed to meet and confer regarding discovery and follow the Judges standing order as to any live discovery disputes. Court-connected mediation is discussed. Parties are directed to meet and confer and e-file within one week from today (1/18/22) a stipulation and proposed order selecting an ADR process w/a 120-day deadline. The Court sets the following deadlines: February 16, 2022-amended pleadings; July 25, 2022-close of fact discovery; August 8, 2022-opening expert reports; August 26, 2022-rebuttal expert reports; September 5, 2022-close of expert discovery; October 13, 2022 at 2:00 p.m.-last day to hear dispositive motions; January 3, 2023 at 3:00 p.m.-pre-trial conference; and January 16, 2023 at 8:30 a.m.-4-day jury trial. Written scheduling order to issue. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/11/2022)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Karin Kuemerle (Kuemerle, Karin) (Filed on 1/11/2022)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING #15 MOTION to Remand. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 12/22/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/11/2022 02:00 PM.This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III.(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2021)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Court takes the pending #15 motion to remand filings under submission. The hearing and the case management conference previously scheduled for December 16, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. are vacated. The Court will issue a written order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2021)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Gregory P. Ricksecker and Ford Motor Company. (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 12/9/2021) Modified on 12/10/2021 (jml, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS (re #15 MOTION to Remand ) filed byFord Motor Company. (Jun, Patricia) (Filed on 9/24/2021) Modified on 9/27/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPLY (re #15 MOTION to Remand ) filed byGregory P. Ricksecker. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Plaintiff's Evidentiary Objections to Mortenson Declaration)(Law, Daniel) (Filed on 9/22/2021)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #15 MOTION to Remand ) filed byFord Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Michael D. Mortenson, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Declaration)(Jun, Patricia) (Filed on 9/15/2021)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the initial case management conference, previously set for September 21, 2021, is continued to December 16, 2021, at 2:00 p.m., to be held along with the hearing on the #15 motion to remand. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2021)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the hearing on the #15 motion to remand, previously set for December 16, 2021 will be held on that date before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2021)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Remand filed by Gregory P. Ricksecker. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2021 03:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 9/15/2021. Replies due by 9/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Remand)(Law, Daniel) (Filed on 9/1/2021)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options submitted by Defendant Ford Motor Company (Jun, Patricia) (Filed on 8/31/2021)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 8/27/2021)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING #11 STIPULATION by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2021) Modified on 8/25/2021 to correct order title (wft, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Gregory P. Ricksecker and Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Law in Support of Joint Stipulation to Continue September 21, 2021 Case Management Conference, #2 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Continue September 21, 2021 Case Management Conference)(Law, Daniel) (Filed on 8/24/2021) Modified on 8/25/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Law (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 8/24/2021)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia H. Jun as to Defendant Ford Motor Company (Jun, Patricia) (Filed on 7/28/2021)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for September 21, 2021, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by September 14th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:21-cv-04681-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2021)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to case,. Signed by The Clerk on 7/2/21. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2021)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2021)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ford Motor Company.. (Mortenson, Michael) (Filed on 7/1/2021)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/10/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/17/2021 02:00 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2021)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/6/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2021)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Profiles for attorneys Michael M. Mortenson and Craig A. Taggart updated on the docket. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2021)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Parties' names should NOT be entered in capitalized letters. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Notic e of Removal. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2021)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Mortenson, Michael) (Filed on 6/18/2021)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Somona. Their case number is SCV-267807. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16089665). Filed byFORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Mortenson, #2 *copy of Complaint attached * Exhibit 1 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #3 Exhibit 2 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #4 Exhibit 3 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #5 Exhibit 4 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #6 Exhibit 5 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mortenson, Michael) (Filed on 6/17/2021) Modified on 6/21/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ricksecker v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Represented By: Michael Donn Mortenson
Represented By: Craig Allen Taggart
Represented By: Patricia H. Jun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY P. RICKSECKER
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Daniel A. Law
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Ariel S. Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Nadine Alsaadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?