Winninger v. Scott et al
Plaintiff: Mollie Winninger
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente San Rafael Medical Center, Cassius Scott, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals and The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv04689
Filed: June 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for October 5, 2021, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by September 28, 2021. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:21-cv-04689-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Case Management Statement due by 9/28/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2021)
July 12, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Cassius Scott, The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2021)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 07/09/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2021)
July 9, 2021 Filing 6 First Amended Complaint for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial
July 6, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2021)
July 6, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mollie Winninger.. (McLetchie, Margaret) (Filed on 7/6/2021)
June 22, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/16/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2021)
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/6/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2021)
June 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial against Kaiser Permanente San Rafael Medical Center, Cassius Scott (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0971-16090615). Filed by Mollie Winninger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McLetchie, Margaret) (Filed on 6/18/2021) Modified on 6/22/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winninger v. Scott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mollie Winninger
Represented By: Margaret Ann McLetchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente San Rafael Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassius Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?