Fayal v. Cook Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Fayal
Defendant: Cook Medical LLC, Cook Medical Incorporated, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, Cook Group, Inc. and Cook Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2021cv04820
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2021 Filing 15 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-154) MDL 2570: Transferring case to the U.S. District Court, Southern District of Indiana. Signed by The Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, on 07/30/2021. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2021)
July 30, 2021 Case electronically transferred to the U.S. District Court, Southern District of Indiana as case no. 1:21-cv-6526-RLY-TAB. Counsel notified. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2021)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/14/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2021 at 02:00 PM - Videoconference Only. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/29/2021. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2021)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman no longer assigned to case,. Signed by The Clerk on 7/28/21. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2021)
July 28, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2021)
July 27, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michael Fayal.. (Rizkalla, Ruth) (Filed on 7/27/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Second Notice Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/9/2021. (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2021) (glmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/26/2021 (glmS, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Fayal. All Defendants. (Rizkalla, Ruth) (Filed on 7/19/2021)
July 9, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2021)
June 29, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Cook Group, Inc., Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical LLC, William Cook Europe APS. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2021)
June 29, 2021 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/14/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2021 02:00 PM in McKinleyville. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2021)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case,. Signed by The Clerk on 6/28/21. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2021)
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet by Michael Fayal Venue Changed to Eureka Division. (Rizkalla, Ruth) (Filed on 6/25/2021)
June 25, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/9/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2021)
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Rizkalla, Ruth) (Filed on 6/25/2021)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cook Group, Inc., Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical LLC, William Cook Europe APS (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16113883). Filed by Michael Fayal. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rizkalla, Ruth) (Filed on 6/25/2021) Modified on 6/29/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fayal v. Cook Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Fayal
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Represented By: John T. Kirtley, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?