Richburg v. Department of the Treasury et al
Plaintiff: Leon Richburg
Defendant: Department of the Treasury and Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 4:2021cv05057
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC AGB
Referring Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2021 Filing 6 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/6/2021. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/6/2021. ***Civil Case Terminated. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 30, 2021 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 1:21-cv-01478. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Order Directing Clerk to Transfer case to United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 6/28/2021. (c/m 6/29/2021 bas, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Leon Richburg(bas, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, filed by Leon Richburg. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bas, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richburg v. Department of the Treasury et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Richburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?