Randle v. Internal Revenue Service et al
Plaintiff: Willie Randle
Defendant: Jane Doe, John Doe and Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 4:2021cv05058
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC AGB
Referring Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2021 Filing 10 Receipt from Willie Randle (Receipt #: 44611017225). (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2021)
August 5, 2021 Filing 9 Letter to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton re Payment Information from Willie Randle. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2021)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/23/2021. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 16, 2021 Filing 7 Letter re IFP, from Willie Randle, dated 07/12/21. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2021)
June 30, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 8/9/2021. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 30, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 6:21-cv-00174. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Plaintiff's lawsuit is TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of California, Oakland Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 06/21/21. (mll, )
June 21, 2021 Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of California, Oakland Division. (mll, )
May 4, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. ***MAILED Consent Form to plaintiff. (mll, )
May 3, 2021 Filing 2 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge K Nicole Mitchell. (mll, )
May 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jane Doe, John Doe, Internal Revenue Service, filed by Willie Randle.(mll, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Randle v. Internal Revenue Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Randle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?