(PC) Yocom v. Biden et al
Plaintiff: Michael Alan Yocom
Defendant: Joe Biden and Kamala D. Harris
Case Number: 4:2021cv05228
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC CHC
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Acknowledging Receipt of Case Transfer in from the Eastern District of California, Case No. 1:21cv01015DADBAM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 8, 2021 Filing 3 Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 1:21-cv-01015. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 7, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 8/16/2021. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Clerk of the Court to Administratively Redesignate Case as a Prisoner Action and ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Northern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/30/2021. (Jessen, A)
July 1, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Order served on Michael Alan Yocom. (Jessen, A)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joe Biden, Kamala Harris by Michael Alan Yocom. (Rivera, O)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Yocom v. Biden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Alan Yocom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Biden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamala D. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?