Seddo et al v. General Electric Company et al
Plaintiff: Vincent Seddo and Xochitl Seddo
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company, Foster Wheeler Corporation, IMO Industries Inc. and Spirax Sarco, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv05347
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Joy Wai Jun Chu as Lead Trial Counsel (Chu, Kimberly) (Filed on 8/20/2021)
August 18, 2021 Filing 29 Certificate of Interested Entities by IMO Industries Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Fluid Handling LLC, Corporate Parent IMO Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation, a publicly traded company for IMO Industries Inc.. (Bailey, Bobbie) (Filed on 8/18/2021)
August 18, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Bobbie Rae Bailey (Bailey, Bobbie) (Filed on 8/18/2021)
August 18, 2021 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint byIMO Industries Inc.. (Bailey, Bobbie) (Filed on 8/18/2021)
August 18, 2021 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE PROOF OF SERVICE FOR DEFENDANT IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. by Vincent Seddo, Xochitl Seddo. (Donadio, David) (Filed on 8/18/2021) Modified on 8/19/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2021 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE PROOF OF SERVICE FOR DEFENDANT SPIRAX SARCO, INC. by Vincent Seddo, Xochitl Seddo. (Donadio, David) (Filed on 8/18/2021) Modified on 8/19/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2021 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEPROOF OF SERVICE FOR DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY by Vincent Seddo, Xochitl Seddo. (Donadio, David) (Filed on 8/18/2021) Modified on 8/19/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2021 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION) by Vincent Seddo, Xochitl Seddo. (Donadio, David) (Filed on 8/18/2021) Modified on 8/19/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Elisabet Gage (Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 8/12/2021)
August 12, 2021 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Spirax Sarco, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Spirax-Sarco Investments, LTD., Other Affiliate Spirax-Sarco Engineering, plc, Other Affiliate Sarco International Corporation, a Delaware corporation for Spirax Sarco, Inc.. (Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 8/12/2021)
August 10, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Elizabeth Anselmo on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Anselmo, Emily) (Filed on 8/10/2021)
August 10, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Paige Gardiner on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Gardiner, Katherine) (Filed on 8/10/2021)
August 10, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles T. Sheldon on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Sheldon, Charles) (Filed on 8/10/2021)
August 10, 2021 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 8/10/2021)
August 10, 2021 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 8/10/2021)
August 10, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand byGeneral Electric Company. (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 8/10/2021)
August 10, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Johnson on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 8/10/2021)
August 10, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand bySpirax Sarco, Inc.. (Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 8/10/2021)
August 6, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Foster Wheeler LLC re #1 Complaint, (Park, Charles) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 6, 2021 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Foster Wheeler LLC identifying Corporate Parent Amec Foster Wheeler plc, a publicly traded company for Foster Wheeler LLC. (Park, Charles) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 6, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles S. Park (Park, Charles) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 6, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Foster Wheeler LLC.. (Park, Charles) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 6, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint byFoster Wheeler LLC. (Park, Charles) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
July 13, 2021 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 10/11/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/18/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2021)
July 13, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Foster Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company, IMO Industries Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2021)
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2021)
July 13, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Donadio, David) (Filed on 7/13/2021)
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Vincent Seddo (Donadio, David) (Filed on 7/13/2021)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Vincent Seddo.. (Donadio, David) (Filed on 7/13/2021)
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Asbestos Personal Injury/ Products Liability/ Loss of Consortium; Demand for Jury Trial against Foster Wheeler LLC (fka Foster Wheeler Corporation), General Electric Company, IMO Industries Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16170167.). Filed byXochitl Seddo, Vincent Seddo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Donadio, David) (Filed on 7/13/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seddo et al v. General Electric Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: Charles S. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Derek S. Johnson
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Anselmo
Represented By: Charles T. Sheldon
Represented By: Katherine Paige Gardiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Corporation
Represented By: Charles S. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc.
Represented By: Bobbie Rae Bailey
Represented By: Edward Martinovich
Represented By: Frederick W. Gatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirax Sarco, Inc.
Represented By: Lance Douglas Wilson
Represented By: Nicole Elisabet Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Seddo
Represented By: Alan R. Brayton
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Represented By: Kimberly Joy Wai Jun Chu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xochitl Seddo
Represented By: Alan R. Brayton
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Represented By: Kimberly Joy Wai Jun Chu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?