Marin County Homeless Union et al v. City of Novato et al
Plaintiff: Marin County Homeless Union, Camp Compassion, Jason Sarris, Lea Deangelo, Zach Bulware, Carrie Healon, Lisa Nicole Johnson, Donald Hobbs, Deborah Ann Miramontes, Charles Talbot, Bethany Allen, Michaelangelo Montez and Kalani Welch
Defendant: City of Novato, Adam McGill, Pat Eklund, Eric Lucan, Matthew McCaffrey and Chris Blunk
Case Number: 4:2021cv05401
Filed: July 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman: Settlement Conference held on 9/10/2021.FTR Time: Not recorded. Plaintiff Attorney: Anthony Prince with Plaintiff, Jason Sarris. Defendant Attorneys: Liliane Wyckoff and Carmen Brock with City Manager Jeff Walter and City Manager Adam McGill (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/10/2021)
August 26, 2021 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman: Settlement Conference held on 8/26/2021. Further Settlement Conference set for 9/10/2021 10:00 AM in McKinleyville, Telephone Conference Only. Courtroom deputy to provide telephone instructions by separate communication. FTR Time: Not recorded. Plaintiff Attorney: Anthony Prince with Plaintiffs, Jason Sarris and Robbie Powelson. Defendant Attorney: Liliane Wyckoff and Carmen Brock with City Manager Jeff Walter and City Manager Adam McGill. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/26/2021)
August 5, 2021 Filing 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman: Settlement Conference held on 8/5/2021. Parties to exchange information. Further Settlement Conference set for 8/26/2021 10:00 AM in McKinleyville, Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom Meeting.Settlement Conference Meeting Access: All counsel and parties may access the meeting information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/rmi . Parties are instructed to scroll past the webinar link to the bolded non-public meetings section to use the link included there for private meetings.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Further Settlement Conference set for 8/26/2021 10:00 AM in McKinleyville, Videoconference Only. FTR Time: Not recorded. Time: 3 hours 7 minutes. Plaintiff Attorney: Anthony Prince. Representatives Jason Serris and Robbie Powelson attended. Defendant Attorneys: Liliane Wyckoff and Carmen Brock. City Attorney Jeff Walter and City Attorney for Novato, Adam McGill attended. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/5/2021) Modified on 8/5/2021 (glmS, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2021 Filing 26 City of Novato's ANSWER to Amended Complaint for Injunctive Relief and a Declaratory Judgment byChris Blunk, City of Novato, Pat Eklund, Eric Lucan, Matthew McCaffrey, Adam McGill. (Brock, Carmen) (Filed on 8/3/2021)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER [*AS AMENDED BY THE COURT*] by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #23 Stipulation Continuing Evidentiary Hearing on OSC to 10/6/2021 at 9:00AM. Reply due by 9/16/2021. Order to Show Cause Hearing/Evidentiary Hearing set for 10/6/2021 09:00 AM. The Temporary Restraining Order as modified on 7/27/2021 will remain in effect through 10/6/2021.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2021)
July 30, 2021 Filing 23 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Continuing Evidentiary Hearing on Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction re #16 Order on Motion for TRO filed by Chris Blunk, City of Novato, Pat Eklund, Eric Lucan, Matthew McCaffrey, Adam McGill. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Continuing Evidentiary Hearing)(Brock, Carmen) (Filed on 7/30/2021) Modified on 8/2/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2021 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman: Settlement Conference discussions held on 7/28/2021. Parties will confer regarding potential stipulation for extending time for hearing date. Meanwhile a Settlement Conference is set for 8/5/2021 10:00 AM in Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom meeting.Meeting Access: All counsel and parties may access the meeting information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/rmi . Please scroll past the webinar link to the non-public meetings area and find the private meeting link there.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Settlement Conference set for 8/5/2021 10:00 AM in Videoconference Only.FTR Time: Not recorded. Plaintiff Attorney: Anthony Prince. Defendant Attorney: Lilian e Wyckoff and Carmen Brock. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/28/2021)
July 28, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Carmen Anne Brock within the Same Firm (Brock, Carmen) (Filed on 7/28/2021)
July 27, 2021 Filing 20 Response to Order to Show Cause #8 Order,, Order to Show Cause, Opposition to Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction byChris Blunk, City of Novato, Pat Eklund, Eric Lucan, Matthew McCaffrey, Adam McGill. (Attachments: #1 2021-07-27 Objections to Evidence submitted ISO Plfs Ex Parte, #2 Declaration of Sophia Winter, #3 Declaration of Joshua Wax, #4 Declaration of Alan Bates, #5 Declaration of Alejandro Muller, #6 Declaration of Adam McGill)(Wyckoff, Liliane) (Filed on 7/27/2021)
July 27, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Liliane Wyckoff (Wyckoff, Liliane) (Filed on 7/27/2021)
July 27, 2021 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE Scheduling Conference set for 7/28/2021 at 10:00 AM. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-684-8852Access Code: 1868782The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Scheduling Conference set for 7/28/2021 10:00 AM in McKinleyville, Telephone Conference Only before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2021)
July 27, 2021 Filing 17 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robert Illman for Settlement per Order Dkt. no. #16 (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2021)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part #13 Motion to Modify TRO ; Modifying Briefing regarding Order to Show Cause ; Setting Evidentiary Hearing; Referring to Magistrate Judge Illman for Settlement Conference. Replies due by 8/2/2021. Evidentiary Hearing 8/9/2021 at Noon. Further Evidentiary Hearing 8/10/2021 at 9:00AM. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2021)
July 27, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman for Settlement (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Motion Hearing held on 7/26/2021 re #13 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (to Modify) filed by Eric Lucan, City of Novato, Pat Eklund, Matthew McCaffrey, Adam McGill, Chris Blunk. Total Time in Court: 31 minutes. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 15 Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Modify TRO filed byBethany Allen, Zach Bulware, Camp Compassion, Lea Deangelo, Carrie Healon, Donald Hobbs, Lisa Nicole Johnson, Marin County Homeless Union, Deborah Ann Miramontes, Michaelangelo Montez, Jason Sarris, Charles Talbot, Kalani Welch. (Prince, Anthony) (Filed on 7/26/2021) Modified on 7/27/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Evidentiary Hearing set for 8/9/2021 12:00 PM IN PERSON AND IN COURTROOM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Further Evidentiary Hearing set for 8/10/2021 09:00 AM IN PERSON AND IN COURTROOM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. NO ZOOM Videoconference will be in use for the hearings. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 23, 2021 Filing 14 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING FOR THE Motion #13 Hearing set for 7/26/2021 01:30 PM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr Please click the link below to join webinar (public hearings). If you are a case participant, you will join as an attendee, then you will be brought into the proceeding by court staff.https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1618764848?pwd=bW03Y2NvV0YrK2FQSkxoMXRxOWprQT09Webinar ID: 161 876 4848Password: 715550Local telephone dial-in:US: +1 (669) 254-5252 or +1 (646) 828-7666General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #http s://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion to Modify TRO #13 Hearing set for 7/26/2021 01:30 PM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (Related documents(s) #13 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2021)
July 23, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (to Modify) filed by Chris Blunk, City of Novato, Pat Eklund, Eric Lucan, Matthew McCaffrey, Adam McGill. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam McGill, #2 Declaration of Mary Kay Sweeney, #3 Declaration of Jeffrey Walter, #4 Proposed Order to Modify TRO)(Wyckoff, Liliane) (Filed on 7/23/2021)
July 23, 2021 Set/Reset Hearing: Motion to Modify TRO Hearing set for Monday, 7/26/2021 01:30 PM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2021)
July 19, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #12 Order on Stipulation., Set/Reset Hearing re #12 Order on Stipulation: City's Responses due by 7/27/2021. Replies due by 8/3/2021. Order to Show Cause Hearing re-set for Tuesday, 8/10/2021 10:00 AM. Temporary Restraining Order in effect through 8/10/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2021)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ** AS AMENDED BY THE COURT ** by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #11 Stipulation. (ygrlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2021)
July 19, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Modify Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date on Order to Show Cause re: Preliminary Injunction filed by Chris Blunk, City of Novato, Pat Eklund, Eric Lucan, Matthew McCaffrey, Adam McGill. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Graham, Pamela) (Filed on 7/19/2021)
July 18, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bethany Allen, Zach Bulware, Camp Compassion, Lea Deangelo, Carrie Healon, Donald Hobbs, Lisa Nicole Johnson, Marin County Homeless Union, Deborah Ann Miramontes, Michaelangelo Montez, Jason Sarris, Charles Talbot, Kalani Welch (Prince, Anthony) (Filed on 7/18/2021)
July 18, 2021 Filing 9 Declaration of Jason Sarris, Carrie Healon, Zach Bulware, Lea Dangelo, Flojaune Cofer, Charles Talbot signed as ordered filed byBethany Allen, Zach Bulware, Camp Compassion, Lea Deangelo, Carrie Healon, Donald Hobbs, Lisa Nicole Johnson, Marin County Homeless Union, Deborah Ann Miramontes, Michaelangelo Montez, Jason Sarris, Charles Talbot, Kalani Welch. (Prince, Anthony) (Filed on 7/18/2021)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re #1 and #3 ; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Order to Show Cause Hearing set for Wednesday, 7/28/2021 01:30 PM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference. Opposition due by 7/20/2021; Reply due 7/23/2021 by noon. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/15/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2021)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 7/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2021)
July 15, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2021)
July 15, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/13/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/20/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2021)
July 15, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/29/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2021)
July 14, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED Ex Parte Application and Complaint against City of Novato, et al. with jury demand (no process) Filed by Marin County Homeless Union. (Prince, Anthony) (Filed on 7/14/2021) Modified on 7/15/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/15/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2021 Filing 2 AMENDED Ex Parte Application and Complaint against City of Novato against Marin County Homeless Union. Filed by Marin County Homeless Union. (Prince, Anthony) (Filed on 7/14/2021) Modified on 7/15/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2021 Filing 1 EX PARTE APPLICATION AND COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against Marin County Homeless Union ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16176308.). Filed by Marin County Homeless Union. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Add'l Declarations and [Proposed] Order)(Prince, Anthony) (Filed on 7/14/2021) Modified on 7/15/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect Civil Cover sheet filed, go to the courts website for this district to find the correct Civil Cover sheet and refile. Complaint has incorrec t Jurisdiction shown, refile an Amended Complaint showing the correct Jurisdiction. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Marin County Homeless Union (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marin County Homeless Union et al v. City of Novato et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marin County Homeless Union
Represented By: Anthony David Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camp Compassion
Represented By: Anthony David Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Sarris
Represented By: Anthony David Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lea Deangelo
Represented By: Anthony David Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zach Bulware
Represented By: Anthony David Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Healon
Represented By: Anthony David Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Nicole Johnson
Represented By: Anthony David Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Hobbs
Represented By: Anthony David Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Ann Miramontes
Represented By: Anthony David Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Talbot
Represented By: Anthony David Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bethany Allen
Represented By: Anthony David Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michaelangelo Montez
Represented By: Anthony David Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalani Welch
Represented By: Anthony David Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Novato
Represented By: Carmen Anne Brock
Represented By: Liliane Wyckoff
Represented By: Pamela Kentos Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam McGill
Represented By: Carmen Anne Brock
Represented By: Liliane Wyckoff
Represented By: Pamela Kentos Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Eklund
Represented By: Carmen Anne Brock
Represented By: Liliane Wyckoff
Represented By: Pamela Kentos Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Lucan
Represented By: Carmen Anne Brock
Represented By: Liliane Wyckoff
Represented By: Pamela Kentos Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew McCaffrey
Represented By: Carmen Anne Brock
Represented By: Liliane Wyckoff
Represented By: Pamela Kentos Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Blunk
Represented By: Carmen Anne Brock
Represented By: Liliane Wyckoff
Represented By: Pamela Kentos Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?